Djm Trustees No. 65 Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032147339) was launched on 10 Jul 2009. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 205 Queen Street, Tower One, Level 8, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, service). Level 11, 19 Victoria Street West, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 23 Aug 2018. 1 share is issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Brookfields Legal Services Limited (an entity) located at 205 Queen Street, Auckland postcode 1010. Our data was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
205 Queen Street, Tower One, Level 8, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service & registered | 23 Aug 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Deborah Jane Miller
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 10 Jul 2009 |
Director | 10 Jul 2009 - current |
Alison Claire Gilbert
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 10 Dec 2019 |
Director | 10 Dec 2019 - 01 Sep 2022 |
Christopher Ogilvy Paterson
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 10 Dec 2019 |
Director | 10 Dec 2019 - 01 Sep 2022 |
Howard Paul Johnston
Mangawhai, Wellsford, 0975
Address used since 16 Aug 2016 |
Director | 24 Jul 2009 - 03 Jul 2020 |
Harold Ian Martin Mccombe
Penrose, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 02 Sep 2014
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 23 Aug 2019 |
Director | 24 Jul 2009 - 13 Jan 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 11, 19 Victoria Street West, Auckland | Physical & registered | 10 Jul 2009 - 23 Aug 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brookfields Legal Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039139764 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
205 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
10 Jul 2009 - current |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |