Verian Group New Zealand Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032148459) was incorporated on 09 Mar 1981. 13 addresess are in use by the company: Level 9, 101 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, service). 6-10 The Strand, Takapuna, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 02 May 2018. 125361 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 125361 shares (100 per cent of shares). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 24 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6-10 The Strand, Takapuna, Auckland | Other (Address For Share Register) | 29 Jul 2008 |
Level 1, 46 Sale Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 02 May 2018 |
The Bond, Level 6, 30 Hickson Road, Millers Point, 2000 | Postal | 31 Aug 2020 |
Level 1, 46 Sale Street, Auckland, 1010 | Office | 31 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michelle H. | Director | 31 Aug 2022 - current |
Richard Charles Ashby
Hobsonville, Auckland, 0618
Address used since 16 Feb 2024 |
Director | 16 Feb 2024 - current |
Katherine Jane O'donoghue
Nsw, 2011
Address used since 31 Aug 2022 |
Director | 31 Aug 2022 - 16 Apr 2024 |
Ashley Moore
Sydney, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Sydney, Nsw, 2028
Address used since 31 Aug 2022 |
Director | 31 Aug 2022 - 16 Apr 2024 |
Paul Alexandre Durant
Klong-ton Nua, Bangkok, 10110
Address used since 05 Dec 2019 |
Director | 05 Dec 2019 - 31 Aug 2022 |
David Charles Thomas
Rd2, Albany, 0792
Address used since 12 Apr 2021 |
Director | 12 Apr 2021 - 31 Aug 2022 |
Brian Turner
Torbay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 23 Apr 2018 |
Director | 23 Apr 2018 - 12 Apr 2021 |
Robert Mclachlan
Collaroy, 2097
Address used since 27 Sep 2018
Millers Point, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 27 Sep 2018 - 05 Dec 2019 |
Jason Trevor Shoebridge
Northcote Point, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 16 Oct 2017 |
Director | 16 Oct 2017 - 27 Sep 2018 |
Frawley Richard
North Sydney, Sydney Nsw, 2060
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
North Sydney, Sydney Nsw, 2060
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
North Sydney, Sydney Nsw, 2060
Address used since 09 Aug 2016 |
Director | 09 Aug 2016 - 09 Feb 2018 |
Robert John Mclachlan
Millers Point, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Collaroy, Nsw, 2097
Address used since 18 Sep 2017 |
Director | 18 Sep 2017 - 16 Oct 2017 |
Herbert To
184 Forbes Streeet, Darlinghurst Nsw, 2010
Address used since 18 Sep 2017
Millers Point, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 18 Sep 2017 - 16 Oct 2017 |
Adrian Peder Gonzalez
Singapore, 258857
Address used since 13 Aug 2015 |
Director | 04 Mar 2005 - 18 Sep 2017 |
Jacqueline Mary Ireland
Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 19 Dec 2013 |
Director | 19 Dec 2013 - 09 Aug 2016 |
Richard Leith Brunton
Whenuapai, Auckland, 0618
Address used since 29 Jul 2008 |
Director | 01 Mar 1992 - 19 Dec 2013 |
James Henry Armstrong
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Feb 2003 |
Director | 01 Feb 2003 - 15 Feb 2007 |
Felicity Joan Hopkins
Campbells Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 11 Oct 2002 |
Director | 11 Oct 2002 - 11 Jul 2006 |
Brian Arthur Milnes
R.d. 1, Kaukapakapa, Auckland,
Address used since 11 Oct 2002 |
Director | 11 Oct 2002 - 20 May 2005 |
John Colvin Shanahan
Devonport, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Mar 1992 |
Director | 01 Mar 1992 - 11 Oct 2002 |
Diana Neave
Karori, Wellington,
Address used since 01 Mar 1992 |
Director | 01 Mar 1992 - 16 Oct 1995 |
Christopher Vaughan
Glenfield, Auckland 10,
Address used since 01 Mar 1992 |
Director | 01 Mar 1992 - 16 Oct 1995 |
Murray Alexander Mccaw
Wellington,
Address used since 13 Sep 1993 |
Director | 13 Sep 1993 - 16 Oct 1995 |
Hester Rebecca Cooper
Torbay, Auckland 10,
Address used since 01 Mar 1992 |
Director | 01 Mar 1992 - 31 Dec 1994 |
Andrew Stephen Fletcher
Wellington 4,
Address used since 01 Mar 1992 |
Director | 01 Mar 1992 - 30 Jun 1993 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 46 Sale Street, Auckland, 1010 | Office | 31 Aug 2020 |
Level 1, 46 Sale Street,, Auckland, 1010 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister & other (Address for Records) & records (Address For Share Register) | 31 Aug 2020 |
Level 9, 101 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Records & shareregister | 05 Jul 2024 |
Level 9, 101 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & service | 15 Jul 2024 |
Level 1 , 46 Sale Street , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6-10 The Strand, Takapuna, Auckland | Registered & physical | 05 Aug 2008 - 02 May 2018 |
Ground Floor, 1/7 The Strand, Takapuna, Auckland | Physical | 01 Sep 1997 - 05 Aug 2008 |
1 Pupuke Road, Takapuna 9, Auckland | Registered | 30 Sep 1994 - 05 Aug 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mantle Netherlands Holdings B.v. Other (Other) |
13 Sep 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Milnes, Brian Arthur Individual |
Rd 1 Kaukapakapa, Auckland |
16 Oct 2003 - 02 Oct 2006 |
Ung, Phillipa Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
16 Oct 2003 - 16 Oct 2003 |
Armstrong, James Henry Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
16 Oct 2003 - 02 Oct 2006 |
Turner, Brian Individual |
Takapuna, Auckland 0620 |
01 May 2012 - 26 May 2021 |
Pappafloratos, Harry Individual |
Karori Wellington |
13 Oct 2004 - 01 May 2012 |
Clark, Vanessa Bridget Individual |
Takapuna, Auckland 0620 |
01 May 2012 - 28 Jul 2014 |
Vaughan, Christopher Individual |
Glenfield Auckland 10 |
09 Mar 1981 - 25 Jul 2016 |
Brunton, Richard Leith Individual |
Whenuapai Auckland |
04 Jul 2007 - 13 Aug 2013 |
Millward Brown NZ Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038103780 Company Number: 853722 Entity |
Level 22, Vero Centre 48 Shortland Street, Auckland |
14 Sep 2005 - 13 Sep 2022 |
Smith, Duncan James Individual |
Takapuna, Auckland 0620 |
01 May 2012 - 26 May 2021 |
Brunton Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037402839 Company Number: 1007450 Entity |
Whenuapai Waitakere 0618 |
09 Mar 1981 - 26 May 2021 |
Colmar, Pauline Florence Individual |
Devonport Auckland |
16 Oct 2003 - 16 Oct 2003 |
Harland, Briar Individual |
Titirangi Auckland |
14 Sep 2005 - 07 Apr 2011 |
Millward Brown NZ Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038103780 Company Number: 853722 Entity |
Auckland 1010 |
14 Sep 2005 - 13 Sep 2022 |
Millward Brown NZ Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038103780 Company Number: 853722 Entity |
Level 22, Vero Centre 48 Shortland Street, Auckland |
14 Sep 2005 - 13 Sep 2022 |
Millward Brown NZ Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038103780 Company Number: 853722 Entity |
Auckland 1010 |
14 Sep 2005 - 13 Sep 2022 |
Millward Brown NZ Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038103780 Company Number: 853722 Entity |
Auckland 1010 |
14 Sep 2005 - 13 Sep 2022 |
Frawley, Richard Individual |
Naremburn Sydney 2065 |
13 Aug 2013 - 16 Oct 2018 |
Thorpe, Sarah Meredith Individual |
The Strand Auckland 0740 |
13 Aug 2013 - 06 Jun 2014 |
Milnes, Virginia Mary Individual |
Kaukapakapa Auckland |
16 Oct 2003 - 13 Oct 2004 |
Dunne, Michael Grant Individual |
Wellington 6011 |
01 May 2012 - 26 May 2021 |
Dunne, Michael Grant Individual |
Wellington 6011 |
01 May 2012 - 26 May 2021 |
Smith, Duncan James Individual |
Takapuna, Auckland 0620 |
01 May 2012 - 26 May 2021 |
Brunton Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037402839 Company Number: 1007450 Entity |
Whenuapai Waitakere 0618 |
09 Mar 1981 - 26 May 2021 |
Brunton Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037402839 Company Number: 1007450 Entity |
Whenuapai Auckland 0618 |
09 Mar 1981 - 26 May 2021 |
Turner, Brian Individual |
Takapuna, Auckland 0620 |
01 May 2012 - 26 May 2021 |
Milnes, Brian Arthur Individual |
Rd 1 Kaukapakapa, Auckland |
16 Oct 2003 - 02 Oct 2006 |
Young, Joan O Individual |
Wellington |
16 Oct 2003 - 16 Oct 2003 |
Neave, Diana Individual |
Karori Wellington |
16 Oct 2003 - 16 Oct 2003 |
F J Hopkins Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037085728 Company Number: 1100023 Entity |
16 Oct 2003 - 14 Sep 2005 | |
Evans, John Llewellyn Individual |
Heatherton Vic 3202 |
06 Jun 2014 - 16 Oct 2018 |
Willis, Spencer Charles Individual |
Takapuna, Auckland 0620 |
01 May 2012 - 03 Jun 2016 |
F J Hopkins Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037085728 Company Number: 1100023 Entity |
16 Oct 2003 - 14 Sep 2005 | |
Pearlfish Investments Pty Limited Other |
Lane Cove Sydney 2066 |
13 Aug 2013 - 16 Oct 2018 |
Karen, Taylor Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
09 Mar 1981 - 13 Oct 2004 |
O'sullivan, Christine Jane Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
31 Jul 2012 - 10 Dec 2015 |
Brunton Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037406615 Company Number: 1007449 Entity |
04 Jul 2007 - 01 May 2012 | |
Brunton Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037406615 Company Number: 1007449 Entity |
04 Jul 2007 - 01 May 2012 | |
Ajombi, N Z Individual |
Stanley Bay Auckland |
16 Oct 2003 - 16 Oct 2003 |
Armstrong, Amanda Jill Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
16 Oct 2003 - 02 Oct 2006 |
Ireland, Jacqueline Mary Individual |
Hillcrest Auckland 0627 |
16 Oct 2003 - 21 Jul 2016 |
Effective Date | 31 Aug 2022 |
Name | Trilantic Europe Vi S.c.a Raif |
Type | Private Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 853722 |
Country of origin | LU |
Platypus Shoes Limited Shed 15, 1-3 City Works Depot |
|
Accent Group Limited Shed 15, 1-3 City Works Depot |
|
Dentsu Aotearoa Limited 68 Sale Street |
|
Dentsu Media Aotearoa Limited 68 Sale Street |
|
Carat Aotearoa Limited 68 Sale Street |
|
Val Morgan Cinema Advertising (nz) Limited 68 Sale Street |