O'donnell Trustee Services (No.3) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032156676) was incorporated on 13 Jul 2009. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 209 King Street, Pukekohe (type: physical, other). 1000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
O'donnell, Michael Shaun (an individual) located at Pukekohe, Pukekohe postcode 2120. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
209 King Street, Pukekohe | Physical & registered & service | 13 Jul 2009 |
209 King Street, Pukekohe | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 13 Jul 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Shaun O'donnell
Pukekohe, Auckland, 2120
Address used since 15 Oct 2015
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 19 Jan 2018 |
Director | 13 Jul 2009 - current |
Herbert Gardiner O'donnell
Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 13 Jul 2009 |
Director | 13 Jul 2009 - 31 Oct 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'donnell, Michael Shaun Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
13 Jul 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'donnell, Herbert Gardiner Individual |
Pukekohe |
13 Jul 2009 - 01 Nov 2013 |
Neulara Farms (2012) Limited 209 King Street |
|
Milkwel Dairy Feeds Limited 209 King Street |
|
Odonnell Farms Limited 209 King Street |
|
O'donnell Trustee Services (no. 2) Limited 209 King Street |
|
N L & A A Groen Limited 209 King Street |
|
Pm 4 U Limited 209 King Street |