Kaipara Water Transport Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429032164350) was launched on 02 Oct 1980. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 58 Otaika Road, Whangarei, 0110 (type: physical, registered). Hewletts Road, Whangarei had been their physical address, until 06 Nov 2012. 24000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 6000 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
Semenoff, Stanley Gillies Alexander (an individual) located at Whangarei. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25 per cent of all shares (6000 shares); it includes
Fletcher Concrete and Infrastructure Limited (an entity) - located at Penrose, Auckland. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allotment (12000 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Eyles, Wayne Brian, located at Waihi, Waihi (an individual). Our data was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
58 Otaika Road, Whangarei, 0110 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Nov 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stanley Gillies Alexander Semenoff
Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 27 Jun 2016 |
Director | 30 May 2006 - current |
Wayne Brian Eyles
Waihi, Waihi, 3610
Address used since 14 Dec 2021
Rd 6, Kaihu, 0376
Address used since 05 May 2021
Dargaville, 0310
Address used since 31 Oct 2011 |
Director | 31 Oct 2011 - current |
Cameron Daniel Lee
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Dec 2020 |
Director | 01 Dec 2020 - current |
Rory David Burdon
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 23 Aug 2017 |
Director | 23 Aug 2017 - 30 Sep 2020 |
Andrew Moss
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 30 Apr 2016 |
Director | 30 Apr 2016 - 01 Aug 2017 |
Yvonne Maria Boersma
Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 05 Mar 2014 |
Director | 05 Mar 2014 - 30 Apr 2016 |
Peter James Rooney
Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 24 Oct 2012 |
Director | 24 Oct 2012 - 29 Nov 2013 |
Douglas Mark Harris
Cockle Bay, Manukau, 2014
Address used since 08 Jun 2010 |
Director | 30 Apr 2010 - 29 Mar 2012 |
Maurice Percival Eyles
Dargaville, Dargaville, 0310
Address used since 08 Jun 2010 |
Director | 01 Oct 2001 - 31 Oct 2011 |
Marc Hainen
Pakuranga, Auckland,
Address used since 31 Dec 2006 |
Director | 31 Dec 2006 - 30 Apr 2010 |
Thomas Vincent Brien
Whangarei,
Address used since 01 Oct 2001 |
Director | 01 Oct 2001 - 22 Dec 2006 |
James Sterling Manderson
R D 9, Whangarei,
Address used since 02 Nov 1987 |
Director | 02 Nov 1987 - 01 Oct 2001 |
Bryce James Manderson
Rd 1, Kamo, Whangarei,
Address used since 02 Nov 1987 |
Director | 02 Nov 1987 - 01 Oct 2001 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Hewletts Road, Whangarei | Physical | 31 Mar 2002 - 06 Nov 2012 |
Beach Rd, Dargaville | Registered | 20 Dec 2001 - 20 Dec 2001 |
Hewletts Road, Whangarei | Registered | 20 Dec 2001 - 06 Nov 2012 |
Beach Road, Dargaville | Physical | 15 Jul 1997 - 31 Mar 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Semenoff, Stanley Gillies Alexander Individual |
Whangarei |
07 Jun 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fletcher Concrete And Infrastructure Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037777548 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
02 Oct 1980 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eyles, Wayne Brian Individual |
Waihi Waihi 3610 |
07 Jun 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eyles, Maurice Percival Individual |
Dargaville |
02 Oct 1980 - 02 Dec 2011 |
Fieldco Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Sri Menanti Gunyah Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Windcrest Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Mane Transport Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Sanctuary Palms Trustee Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Alice's Clothing Alterations Limited 58 Otaika Road |