Pest Off Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429032228915) was registered on 26 May 2009. 1 address is currently in use by the company: 464 Taioma Road, Mosgiel, 9092 (type: registered, physical). 177 Leith Street, North Dunedin, Dunedin had been their registered address, until 21 Aug 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Glynn Oaten (an individual) located at Mosgiel postcode 9092. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Victoria Smith (an individual) - located at Mosgiel. Our database was last updated on 13 Jun 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
464 Taioma Road, Mosgiel, 9092 | Registered & physical | 21 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Victoria Louise Smith
Mosgiel, 9092
Address used since 13 Aug 2020
North Dunedin, Dunedin, 9016
Address used since 20 Jun 2012 |
Director | 26 May 2009 - current |
Glynn Desmond Oaten
Mosgiel, 9092
Address used since 13 Aug 2020
North Dunedin, Dunedin, 9016
Address used since 20 Jun 2012 |
Director | 26 May 2009 - current |
Stephen John Boyd
Rd 1, Christchurch, 7671
Address used since 01 Nov 2011 |
Director | 26 May 2009 - 01 Mar 2012 |
Angela Margaret Boyd
Rd 1, Christchurch, 7671
Address used since 01 Nov 2011 |
Director | 26 May 2009 - 01 Mar 2012 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
177 Leith Street, North Dunedin, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 28 Jun 2012 - 21 Aug 2020 |
140 Wallaces Ford Road, Rd 2, Outram, 9074 | Physical & registered | 24 Nov 2011 - 28 Jun 2012 |
140 Wallace Ford Road, Rd2, Outram, 9074 | Registered & physical | 23 Nov 2011 - 24 Nov 2011 |
6 Jones Road, Templeton, Christchurch | Registered | 26 May 2009 - 23 Nov 2011 |
6 Jones Rd, Templeton, Christchurch | Physical | 26 May 2009 - 23 Nov 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Glynn Desmond Oaten Individual |
Mosgiel 9092 |
26 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Victoria Louise Smith Individual |
Mosgiel 9092 |
26 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stephen John Boyd Individual |
Rd 1 Christchurch 7671 |
26 May 2009 - 06 Sep 2012 |
Angela Margaret Boyd Individual |
Rd 1 Christchurch 7671 |
26 May 2009 - 06 Sep 2012 |
Dunedin Taxis Limited 177 Leith Street |
|
Taxis Dunedin Limited 177 Leith Street |
|
Dunedin City Taxis Limited 177 Leith Street |
|
Dunedin Taxis (1965) Limited 177 Leith Street |
|
Cowells Pavlova Kitchen Dunedin Limited 7 Vire Street |
|
Zenrx Limited 156 Frederick Street |