Sdg Independent Trustee Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032285635) was started on 27 Apr 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 5 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered). The Office Malloy Goodwin Harford, Level 1, 5 Broadway, Newmarket had been their physical address, until 22 Oct 2014. Sdg Independent Trustee Limited used other aliases, namely: Capstan Project Management Limited from 27 Apr 2009 to 08 Jun 2011. 300 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 300 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Broadway Five Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Level 1, 5 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland postcode 1023. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the ABS issued to Sdg Independent Trustee Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 5 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 22 Oct 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Geoffrey Ruck
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 12 Oct 2022
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 21 Jul 2011
Greenlane, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 10 Oct 2017
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 09 Oct 2019 |
Director | 21 Jul 2011 - current |
David Guy Moorman
Epsom, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 21 Jul 2011 |
Director | 21 Jul 2011 - current |
Patrick Richard Casey
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 05 Oct 2016 |
Director | 01 Apr 2015 - current |
Marise Francis Allan
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 09 Oct 2018 |
Director | 05 Apr 2018 - current |
Alfred David Harford
Stonefields, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 09 Oct 2018
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 21 Jul 2011 |
Director | 21 Jul 2011 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Vernon Kennerley
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 08 Jun 2011 |
Director | 08 Jun 2011 - 21 Jul 2011 |
Lorraine Mann
Warkworth, 0910
Address used since 27 Apr 2009 |
Director | 27 Apr 2009 - 08 Jun 2011 |
Gordon Mann
Warkworth, 0910
Address used since 27 Apr 2009 |
Director | 27 Apr 2009 - 08 Jun 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
The Office Malloy Goodwin Harford, Level 1, 5 Broadway, Newmarket, 1023 | Physical & registered | 09 Aug 2011 - 22 Oct 2014 |
The Office Of Vernon Kennerley Ltd, 14 King Edward Avenue, Epsom, Auckland | Physical & registered | 27 Apr 2009 - 09 Aug 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Broadway Five Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035128274 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Level 1, 5 Broadway Newmarket, Auckland 1023 |
29 Jul 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kennerley, Vernon Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
08 Jun 2011 - 29 Jul 2011 |
Mann, Gordon Individual |
Warkworth |
27 Apr 2009 - 08 Jun 2011 |
Mann, Lorraine Individual |
Warkworth |
27 Apr 2009 - 08 Jun 2011 |
Name | Broadway Five Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1567151 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 1, 5 Broadway Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
Arnott's New Zealand Limited Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent |
|
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Your Property Services Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Grovers Investments Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
Dmg Trustees (zagalsky) Limited Level 3, 12 Kent Street |
Seajay Trustees Limited Level 1, 109 Carlton Gore Road |
Lk Trustee (no. 200) Limited Level 1, 8 Manukau Road |
Lk Trustee (no. 202) Limited Level 1, 8 Manukau Road |
Lk Trustee (no. 197) Limited Level 1, 8 Manukau Road |
Trustee 1308-105022 Limited Level 4, 128 Broadway |