Handyside Builder Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032309935) was incorporated on 08 Apr 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 444 Queen Street, Kuripuni, Masterton, 3351 (type: registered, service). 444 Queen Street, Kuripuni, Masterton had been their registered address, until 23 Jun 2023. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Handyside, Hugo Alexander (a director) located at Rd 1, Martinborough postcode 5781. Our data was updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
444 Queen Street, Kuripuni, Masterton, 5810 | Physical | 17 Jun 2015 |
444 Queen Street, Kuripuni, Masterton, 3351 | Registered & service | 23 Jun 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Hugo Alexander Handyside
Rd 1, Martinborough, 5781
Address used since 29 Nov 2019
Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 01 Nov 2014 |
Director | 09 Jun 2014 - current |
Dennis Edward Handyside
Rd 1, Martinborough, 5781
Address used since 01 Dec 2013 |
Director | 01 Dec 2013 - 09 Jun 2014 |
Hugo Alexander Handyside
R D 1, Featherston 5771,
Address used since 08 Apr 2009 |
Director | 08 Apr 2009 - 01 Dec 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
444 Queen Street, Kuripuni, Masterton, 5810 | Registered & service | 17 Jun 2015 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Enumerate Limited, 444 Queen Street, Masterton, 5810 | Registered & physical | 15 Feb 2013 - 17 Jun 2015 |
Sadler Oakly Newman Limited, 2 Church Street, Masterton | Physical & registered | 08 Apr 2009 - 15 Feb 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Handyside, Hugo Alexander Director |
Rd 1 Martinborough 5781 |
04 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Handyside, Dennis Edward Individual |
Rd 1 Martinborough 5781 |
06 Dec 2013 - 04 Jul 2014 |
Handyside, Hugo Alexander Individual |
R D 1 Featherston 5771 |
08 Apr 2009 - 06 Dec 2013 |
Dennis Edward Handyside Director |
Rd 1 Martinborough 5781 |
06 Dec 2013 - 04 Jul 2014 |
Anasus Trustee Company Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Don Rob Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Knightrider Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Tula Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Craig John Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |
|
Penny Lane Home Trust Trustees Limited 444 Queen Street |