Mechanical & Technical (2009) Limited (issued a business number of 9429032349146) was incorporated on 27 Mar 2009. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 20 Herekino Street, Whangarei, 0110 (type: registered, physical). Graeme A Doull, Chartered Accountant, Wynn Fraser Bldg, Cnr Cameron &, Albert Sts, Whangarei had been their physical address, up to 05 Jul 2011. 100 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 49 shares (49% of shares), namely:
Jwal Trustees 2011 Limited (an entity) located at Whangarei postcode 0110,
Speight, Shane Murray (an individual) located at Kamo, Whangarei postcode 0112. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Speight, Shane Murray (an individual) - located at Kamo, Whangarei. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Dawson, Warwick Robert, located at Horahora, Whangarei (an individual). Our database was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 20 Herekino Street, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered & physical & service | 05 Jul 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shane Murray Speight
Kamo, 0112
Address used since 20 Aug 2013 |
Director | 27 Mar 2009 - current |
Warwick Robert Dawson
Horahora, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 03 Oct 2018
Rd 2, Tangiteroria, 0381
Address used since 28 Aug 2015 |
Director | 27 Mar 2009 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Graeme A Doull, Chartered Accountant, Wynn Fraser Bldg, Cnr Cameron &, Albert Sts, Whangarei | Physical & registered | 27 Mar 2009 - 05 Jul 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jwal Trustees 2011 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030716612 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whangarei 0110 |
15 Sep 2017 - current |
Speight, Shane Murray Individual |
Kamo Whangarei 0112 |
27 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Speight, Shane Murray Individual |
Kamo Whangarei 0112 |
27 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dawson, Warwick Robert Individual |
Horahora Whangarei 0110 |
27 Mar 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dawson, Warwick Robert Individual |
Horahora Whangarei 0110 |
27 Mar 2009 - current |
Goodland, Shona Individual |
R D 1 Kamo Whangarei 0185 |
03 Oct 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mason, Shona Individual |
Rd 1 Kamo 0185 |
27 Mar 2009 - 03 Oct 2018 |
Doull, Graeme Alexander Individual |
Kamo Kamo 0112 |
27 Mar 2009 - 15 Sep 2017 |
Morris & Co (2013) Limited Level 4, 35 Robert Street |
|
Big Fish Creative Limited Level 1, 4 Vinery Lane |
|
Entico Trustee Limited Level 4, 35 Robert Street |
|
Maq Foundation Trustees Limited Level 1, 5 Hunt Street |
|
Rock Solid Limited Level 1, 5 Hunt Street |
|
Clearwater Crossings Limited Level 4, 35 Robert Street |