Richard Dwyer Nominees Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429032405859) was incorporated on 24 Feb 2009. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 52 High Street, Hawera, 4610 (type: registered, service). 30 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 30 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Forsyth, Janice Maree (an individual) located at Rd 15, Hawera postcode 4675. Our database was updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
46 High Street, Hawera | Registered & physical | 24 Feb 2009 |
35 Manawapou Road, Hawera, 4610 | Registered & service | 07 Dec 2022 |
52 High Street, Hawera, 4610 | Registered & service | 10 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard John Dwyer
Rd 2, Patea, 4598
Address used since 08 Aug 2018 |
Director | 08 Aug 2018 - current |
Janice Maree Forsyth
Rd 15, Hawera, 4675
Address used since 14 Oct 2016 |
Director | 04 Dec 2015 - 26 Jul 2018 |
Geoffrey Nigel Nicholas
Rd 14, Hawera, 4674
Address used since 13 Nov 2017
Rd 14, Hawera, 4674
Address used since 04 Dec 2015 |
Director | 04 Dec 2015 - 26 Jul 2018 |
John Bernard Mccarthy
Wellington, 6011
Address used since 01 Dec 2015 |
Director | 24 Feb 2009 - 06 Mar 2018 |
David Grant Iggulden
Martinborough, 5781
Address used since 01 Dec 2015 |
Director | 24 Feb 2009 - 12 Dec 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Forsyth, Janice Maree Individual |
Rd 15 Hawera 4675 |
14 Dec 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholas, Geoffrey Nigel Individual |
Rd 14 Hawera 4674 |
14 Dec 2015 - 15 Mar 2022 |
Nicholas, Geoffrey Nigel Individual |
Rd 14 Hawera 4674 |
14 Dec 2015 - 15 Mar 2022 |
Mccarthy, John Bernard Individual |
Wellington 6011 |
24 Feb 2009 - 06 Mar 2018 |
Iggulden, David Grant Individual |
Hawera |
24 Feb 2009 - 14 Dec 2015 |
Stockwell Nominees Limited 46 High Street |
|
Cole Nominees Limited 46 High Street |
|
Ngarangi Nominees Limited 46 High Street |
|
Smillie Nominee Limited 46 High Street |
|
Two Seasons Trustee Limited 46 High Street |
|
G & M Weir Nominee Limited 46 High Street |