Johnston Lawrence Trustee Services Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032417289) was incorporated on 21 Jan 2009. 7 addresess are in use by the company: Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, service). Level 11, 157 Lambton Quay, Wellington had been their registered address, until 27 May 2020. 120 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 120 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Johnston Lawrence Limited (an entity) located at Wellington Central, Wellington postcode 6011. Our data was last updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 27 May 2020 |
Po Box 10035, Wellington, Wellington, 6140 | Postal | 02 Sep 2023 |
Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Office & delivery | 02 Sep 2023 |
Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & service | 10 May 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Declan Barrett
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 10 Nov 2023
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 31 May 2011 |
Director | 21 Dec 2010 - current |
Natalie Louisa Smith
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 01 May 2019
Kelburn, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 16 Aug 2017
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 02 May 2018 |
Director | 01 Dec 2014 - current |
Natalie Louisa Gaskin
Miramar, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 01 Dec 2014 |
Director | 01 Dec 2014 - current |
Andrew James Stewart
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Mar 2023 |
Director | 01 Mar 2023 - current |
Matthew Peter Whimp
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 01 Mar 2023 |
Director | 01 Mar 2023 - current |
Richard William Perry
Lower Hutt, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 02 Jun 2010 |
Director | 21 Jan 2009 - 01 Apr 2017 |
Nicholas Burley
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 30 Sep 2011 |
Director | 30 Sep 2011 - 01 Apr 2017 |
Philip John Shannon
Wilton, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 13 Feb 2012 |
Director | 13 Feb 2012 - 01 Apr 2015 |
John Garry Stevens
10 Brandon Street, Wellington,
Address used since 21 Jan 2009 |
Director | 21 Jan 2009 - 30 Sep 2011 |
Roger Chapman
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 02 Jun 2010 |
Director | 21 Jan 2009 - 31 May 2011 |
Ian William Lawrence
10 Brandon Street, Wellington,
Address used since 21 Jan 2009 |
Director | 21 Jan 2009 - 31 May 2011 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & service | 10 May 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 11, 157 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 08 May 2017 - 27 May 2020 |
Johnston Lawrence, Level 5 Deloitte House, 10 Brandon Street, Wellington | Registered & physical | 21 Jan 2009 - 08 May 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Johnston Lawrence Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032334708 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
02 Sep 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stevens, John Garry Individual |
10 Brandon Street Wellington |
21 Jan 2009 - 02 Sep 2011 |
Barrett, Peter Declan Director |
10 Brandon Street Wellington 6011 |
21 Dec 2010 - 02 Sep 2011 |
Chapman, Roger Individual |
10 Brandon Street Wellington |
21 Jan 2009 - 02 Sep 2011 |
Lawrence, Ian William Individual |
10 Brandon Street Wellington |
21 Jan 2009 - 02 Sep 2011 |
Perry, Richard William Individual |
10 Brandon Street Wellington |
21 Jan 2009 - 02 Sep 2011 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Johnston Lawrence Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 2223093 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Sms New Zealand Limited Level 16 |
|
Origin Energy Resources NZ (rimu) Limited Level 24 |
|
Central Wellington Services Limited Level 11 |
|
Hr (oceania) NZ Limited Level 24-mobil On The Park |
|
Hr (oceania) Qt Limited Level 24-mobil On The Park |
|
Pvh Brands NZ Limited 157 Lambton Quay, |