Kuratau Consulting Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429032449488) was launched on 16 Dec 2008. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 6 Godfrey Place, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 (type: registered, physical). 20B Eltham Road, Kohimarama, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 11 Feb 2016. 1000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1 per cent of shares), namely:
Harris, Suzanne Elizabeth (an individual) located at Kohimarama, Auckland postcode 1071. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Harris, Andrew Michael (an individual) - located at Kohimarama, Auckland. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (998 shares, 99.8%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Harris, Suzanne Elizabeth, located at Kohimarama, Auckland (an individual),
Harris, Andrew Michael, located at Kohimarama, Auckland (an individual),
Claymore Partners Trustees (2010) Limited, located at 63 Fort Street, Auckand, Null (an entity). "Marketing consultancy service" (business classification M696252) is the category the ABS issued Kuratau Consulting Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Godfrey Place, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Registered & physical & service | 11 Feb 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Michael Harris
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Jan 2016 |
Director | 16 Dec 2008 - current |
6 Godfrey Place , Kohimarama , Auckland , 1071 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
20b Eltham Road, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Registered & physical | 13 May 2015 - 11 Feb 2016 |
204 Kohimarama Road, Kohimarama, Auckland 1071 | Physical & registered | 16 Dec 2008 - 13 May 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Suzanne Elizabeth Individual |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
16 Dec 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Andrew Michael Individual |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
16 Dec 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Suzanne Elizabeth Individual |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
16 Dec 2008 - current |
Harris, Andrew Michael Individual |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
16 Dec 2008 - current |
Claymore Partners Trustees (2010) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031810128 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
63 Fort Street Auckand Null |
07 Feb 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Terrence John Individual |
161 Kohimarama Road Kohimarama, Auckland 1071 |
16 Dec 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Belharon Investments Limited 10 Godfrey Place |
|
Motutapu Outdoor Education Trust 10 Godfrey Place |
|
Youth Education And Development Charitable Trust Board 10 Godfrey Place |
|
Scarlett Manuka Limited 7 Godfrey Place |
|
Navona Limited 7 Godfrey Place |
|
Thinkworks Coaching Limited 18a Godfrey Place |
Brown Fox Limited 21 Godfrey Place |
Bull & Bear Marketing Limited 79 Grampian Road |
Pureworld Holdings Limited 41 John Rymer Place |
The Retail Collective Limited 81 Speight Road |
Xfactory (retail) Limited 81 Speight Road |
Rypac Holdings Limited 19 Nihill Crescent |