Villa Donna Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032456448) was started on 08 Dec 2008. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 295B Minden Road, Rd6, Te Puna, Tauranga, 3171 (type: office, registered). 417 Belk Road, Rd 1, Tauranga had been their physical address, up to 12 Apr 2018. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Bodell, Donna Marie (an individual) located at Rd 1, Tauranga postcode 3171. Our database was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
295b Minden Road, Rd 6, Tauranga, 3176 | Physical & registered & service | 12 Apr 2018 |
295b Minden Road, Rd6, Te Puna, Tauranga, 3171 | Office | 11 May 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Donna Marie Bodell
Rd 6, Tauranga, 3176
Address used since 04 Apr 2018
Rd 1, Tauranga, 3171
Address used since 04 Sep 2010 |
Director | 08 Dec 2008 - current |
417 Belk Road , Rd 1 , Tauranga , 3171 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
417 Belk Road, Rd 1, Tauranga, 3171 | Physical & registered | 13 Sep 2010 - 12 Apr 2018 |
63 Athena Drive, Totaravale, North Shore City 0629 | Physical & registered | 08 Dec 2008 - 13 Sep 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bodell, Donna Marie Individual |
Rd 1 Tauranga 3171 |
08 Dec 2008 - current |
Onslaught Charitable Trust 489 Belk Road |
|
The Fijian Charitable Trust Board 489 Belk Road |
|
Slip Stream Engineering Limited 26 Lawry Lane |
|
Evotec NZ Limited 28 Lawry Lane |
|
Tauranga Airsoft Club Incorporated 80 Lawry Lane |
|
G4 Consultancy Limited 316/b Belk Road |