Specsavers Mt Maunganui Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429032477559) was started on 19 Nov 2008. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 5, 1 Whitmore Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, service). Level 17, 125 The Terrace, Wellington had been their physical address, up to 05 Mar 2020. 121 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.83% of shares), namely:
Specsavers New Zealand Limited (an entity) located at 1 Whitmore Street, Wellington Central, Wellington postcode 6011. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49.59% of all shares (exactly 60 shares); it includes
Buchanan, Ian Scott (an individual) - located at Papamoa Beach, Papamoa. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (60 shares, 49.59%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Hodge, Clare Louise, located at Otumoetai, Tauranga (an individual),
Hodge, David Frances, located at Otumoetai, Tauranga (an individual). The Businesscheck data was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 18, 125 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Mar 2020 |
Level 5, 1 Whitmore Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & service | 30 Jul 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Darrel Magna
Brighton East, Victoria, 3187
Address used since 21 Nov 2014
Port Melbourne, Victoria, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 19 Nov 2008 - current |
Ian Scott Buchanan
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 16 Feb 2021
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 02 Aug 2016
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 15 Feb 2018 |
Director | 02 Aug 2016 - current |
Claire Louise Hodge
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 01 Mar 2017 - current |
Clare Louise Hodge
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 01 Mar 2017 - current |
Dominic Anthony Savill
Port Melbourne, Vic, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Vic, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Vic, 3186
Address used since 31 Dec 2020 |
Director | 31 Dec 2020 - current |
Jane Emily Hoban
Mount Eliza, Vic, 3930
Address used since 29 May 2023 |
Director | 29 May 2023 - current |
Jarrad Lincoln Schell
Sandringham, Vic, 3191
Address used since 20 Dec 2021 |
Director | 20 Dec 2021 - 29 May 2023 |
Thomas William Craw
Vic, 3191
Address used since 31 Jul 2017
Port Melbourne, Vic, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 31 Jul 2017 - 20 Dec 2021 |
Darrel Robert Magna
Port Melbourne, Victoria, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Brighton, Victoria, 3186
Address used since 20 Jun 2017 |
Director | 19 Nov 2008 - 31 Dec 2020 |
Paul Bott
Port Melbourne, Victoria, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Port Melbourne, Victoria, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Elwood Victoria, 3184
Address used since 19 Jun 2015 |
Director | 19 Nov 2008 - 31 Jul 2017 |
Glenn Paul Dunkerley
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 16 Feb 2016 |
Director | 05 Jun 2009 - 01 Mar 2017 |
Scott Charles Raisbeck
Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 01 Nov 2013 |
Director | 01 Nov 2013 - 30 Nov 2015 |
Tony Han
Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 21 Mar 2011 |
Director | 05 Jun 2009 - 01 Nov 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 17, 125 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 19 Nov 2008 - 05 Mar 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Specsavers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032806410 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
1 Whitmore Street, Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
19 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Buchanan, Ian Scott Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
08 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodge, Clare Louise Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
04 Apr 2017 - current |
Hodge, David Frances Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
04 Apr 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Specsavers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032806410 Company Number: 2116682 Entity |
04 Apr 2017 - 04 Apr 2017 | |
Hodge, Claire Louise Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
10 Mar 2017 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Dunkerley, Glenn Paul Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
18 Jun 2009 - 10 Mar 2017 |
Han, Tony Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
18 Jun 2009 - 01 Nov 2013 |
Null - Clare Louise Hodge And David Francis Hodge As Trustee For Hodge Investment Trust Other |
04 Apr 2017 - 04 Apr 2017 | |
Raisbeck, Scott Charles Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
01 Nov 2013 - 07 Dec 2015 |
Clare Louise Hodge And David Francis Hodge As Trustee For Hodge Investment Trust Other |
04 Apr 2017 - 04 Apr 2017 | |
Specsavers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032806410 Company Number: 2116682 Entity |
04 Apr 2017 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Specsavers International Healthcare Limited |
Type | Company Limited By Shares |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 91524515 |
Country of origin | GG |
Pooja Foods Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Customs Agents Wellington Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Ppem Nominees Limited Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street |
|
Glading Family Trustees Limited Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace |