Specsavers New Lynn Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032485219) was incorporated on 13 Nov 2008. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 5, 1 Whitmore Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, service). Level 17, 125 The Terrace, Wellington had been their registered address, until 05 Mar 2020. 121 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 60 shares (49.59 per cent of shares), namely:
Walsh, Philip Andrew (a director) located at Grey Lynn, Auckland postcode 1021. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49.59 per cent of all shares (60 shares); it includes
Aukusitino, Victoria Etevise Catherine (an individual) - located at Massey, Auckland. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 18, 125 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Mar 2020 |
Level 5, 1 Whitmore Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & service | 30 Jul 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Darrel Magna
Brighton East, Victoria, 3187
Address used since 21 Nov 2014
Port Melbourne, Victoria, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 13 Nov 2008 - current |
Philip Andrew Walsh
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 02 Dec 2014 |
Director | 04 Dec 2009 - current |
Victoria Etevise Catherine Aukusitino
Massey, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 19 Feb 2024
Glendene, Auckland, 0602
Address used since 10 Feb 2021
Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 01 Apr 2019 |
Director | 01 Apr 2019 - current |
Dominic Anthony Savill
Port Melbourne, Vic, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Vic, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Vic, 3186
Address used since 31 Dec 2020 |
Director | 31 Dec 2020 - current |
Jane Emily Hoban
Mount Eliza, Vic, 3930
Address used since 29 May 2023 |
Director | 29 May 2023 - current |
Jarrad Lincoln Schell
Sandringham, Vic, 3191
Address used since 20 Dec 2021 |
Director | 20 Dec 2021 - 29 May 2023 |
Thomas William Craw
Vic, 3191
Address used since 31 Jul 2017
Port Melbourne, Vic, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 31 Jul 2017 - 20 Dec 2021 |
Darrel Robert Magna
Port Melbourne, Victoria, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Brighton, Victoria, 3186
Address used since 20 Jun 2017 |
Director | 13 Nov 2008 - 31 Dec 2020 |
Jonathan William Clements
Oratia, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 22 Jan 2014 |
Director | 04 Dec 2009 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Paul Bott
Port Melbourne, Victoria, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Port Melbourne, Victoria, 3207
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Elwood Victoria, 3184
Address used since 19 Jun 2015 |
Director | 13 Nov 2008 - 31 Jul 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 17, 125 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 13 Nov 2008 - 05 Mar 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walsh, Philip Andrew Director |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
12 Feb 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aukusitino, Victoria Etevise Catherine Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
10 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walsh, Philip Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
01 Feb 2010 - 12 Feb 2018 |
Specsavers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032806410 Company Number: 2116682 Entity |
1 Whitmore Street, Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
13 Nov 2008 - 06 Jul 2018 |
Specsavers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032806410 Company Number: 2116682 Entity |
Level 17, 125 The Terrace Wellington 6011, New Zealand |
13 Nov 2008 - 06 Jul 2018 |
Specsavers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032806410 Company Number: 2116682 Entity |
Wellington 6011 |
13 Nov 2008 - 06 Jul 2018 |
Clements, Jonathan William Individual |
Oratia Auckland 0604 |
01 Feb 2010 - 10 Apr 2019 |
Specsavers New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032806410 Company Number: 2116682 Entity |
Level 17, 125 The Terrace Wellington 6011, New Zealand |
13 Nov 2008 - 06 Jul 2018 |
Clements, Jonathan William Individual |
Oratia Auckland 0604 |
01 Feb 2010 - 10 Apr 2019 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Specsavers International Healthcare Limited |
Type | Company Limited By Shares |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 91524515 |
Country of origin | GG |
Pooja Foods Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Customs Agents Wellington Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Ppem Nominees Limited Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street |
|
Glading Family Trustees Limited Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace |