C A Putt Nominees Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032525786) was registered on 13 Oct 2008. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 67 High Street, Hawera, 4610 (type: registered, physical). 2 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 2 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Htl Nominees Limited (an entity) located at Hawera, Hawera postcode 4610. The Businesscheck data was updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
67 High Street, Hawera, 4610 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Oct 2008 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Christopher Richard Putt
Rd 28, Hawera, 4678
Address used since 31 May 2017 |
Director | 31 May 2017 - current |
Dorothy Anne Putt
Rd 28, Hawera, 4678
Address used since 31 May 2017 |
Director | 31 May 2017 - current |
Geoffrey Nigel Nicholas
Rd 14, Hawera, 4674
Address used since 27 Nov 2015 |
Director | 13 Oct 2008 - 31 May 2017 |
Dean Michael Pratt
Rd 14, Hawera, 4674
Address used since 27 Nov 2015 |
Director | 13 Oct 2008 - 31 May 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Htl Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051231149 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hawera Hawera 4610 |
24 Apr 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pratt, Dean Michael Individual |
Rd 14 Hawera 4674 |
13 Oct 2008 - 24 Apr 2023 |
Pratt, Dean Michael Individual |
Rd 14 Hawera 4674 |
13 Oct 2008 - 24 Apr 2023 |
Nicholas, Geoffrey Nigel Individual |
R D 14 Hawera 4674 |
13 Oct 2008 - 20 Jul 2022 |
Wallis Cameron Developments Limited 67 High Street |
|
Lomas Nominees Limited 67 High Street |
|
D & C Hughes Trustee Limited 67 High Street |
|
Lrc Investments Limited 67 High Street |
|
Dwyer Farms Limited 67 High Street |
|
C A Dwyer Nominees Limited 67 High Street |