Expedia New Zealand Limited (NZBN 9429032568745) was started on 29 Sep 2008. 3 addresses are in use by the company: Suite 18.2, 1 Albert Street, Auckland Cbd, Auckland, 1010 (type: office, registered). Dla Piper Tower, 205 Queen Street, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 19 Aug 2020. 475100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 475100 shares (100% of shares). Our information was last updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 15, Pwc Tower, 15 Customs Street West, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 19 Aug 2020 |
Suite 18.2, 1 Albert Street, Auckland Cbd, Auckland, 1010 | Office | 03 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lance Allen Soliday
Snoqualmie Wa, 98065
Address used since 26 Sep 2011
Wa, 98045
Address used since 10 Nov 2017 |
Director | 26 Sep 2011 - current |
Haley Joy Purdon
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 25 Mar 2020
Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302
Address used since 07 Jun 2019 |
Director | 07 Jun 2019 - current |
Robert John Dzielak | Director | 19 Aug 2022 - current |
Frances Josephine Erskine
Kenmore 98028, Washington,
Address used since 13 Mar 2009
Seattle, Washington, 98105
Address used since 25 Sep 2018 |
Director | 13 Mar 2009 - 19 Aug 2022 |
Stephe Wilks
Sydney, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Middle Cove, Nsw, 2068
Address used since 05 Aug 2021 |
Director | 05 Aug 2021 - 05 Aug 2021 |
Peter Kenneth Gerard Miles
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 27 Apr 2018 |
Director | 27 Apr 2018 - 07 Jun 2019 |
Michael Ross Pearson
Level 16, Sydney, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Level 16, Sydney, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Wahroonga, Nsw, 2076
Address used since 29 Sep 2016
Pymble, Nsw, 2073
Address used since 17 Jul 2017 |
Director | 29 Sep 2016 - 27 Apr 2018 |
Mark Douglas Okerstrom
Seattle, Wa, 98112
Address used since 26 Apr 2016 |
Director | 26 Sep 2011 - 19 Sep 2017 |
Georg Johannes Ruebensal
68 Pitt Street, Sydney, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Elizabeth Bay, Nsw, 2011
Address used since 12 Nov 2015
68 Pitt Street, Sydney, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 12 Mar 2013 - 27 Sep 2016 |
Steven Peter Louden
Kirkland, Washington, 98033
Address used since 27 Sep 2013 |
Director | 27 Sep 2013 - 03 Jul 2015 |
Stuart Schuyler Haas
Seattle, Washington, Usa, 98199
Address used since 03 Aug 2013 |
Director | 29 Sep 2008 - 27 Sep 2013 |
Burke Fremont Norton
Seattle, Washington, 98101
Address used since 31 Dec 2010 |
Director | 29 Sep 2008 - 28 Oct 2011 |
Michael Bruce Adler
Mercer Island 98040, Washington, Usa,
Address used since 19 Jan 2009 |
Director | 29 Sep 2008 - 26 Sep 2011 |
Harvey Smalheiser
Yarrow Point 98004, Washington, Usa,
Address used since 29 Sep 2008 |
Director | 29 Sep 2008 - 13 Mar 2009 |
Suite 18.2, 1 Albert Street , Auckland Cbd , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Dla Piper Tower, 205 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 23 Apr 2015 - 19 Aug 2020 |
C/- Dla Phillips Fox, Level 22, 205 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 24 Dec 2014 - 23 Apr 2015 |
C/- Dla Phillips Fox, Level 22, 205 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 08 Sep 2014 - 23 Apr 2015 |
C/- Rsm Prince, Ford Building, 86 Highbrook Drive, Auckland, 2161 | Physical | 24 Jan 2013 - 08 Sep 2014 |
C/- Rsm Prince, Ford Building, 86 Highbrook Drive, Auckland, 2161 | Registered | 24 Jan 2013 - 24 Dec 2014 |
C/-hudson Gavin Martin, Level 8, 2 Commerce Street, Auckland 1010 | Registered | 07 Oct 2009 - 24 Jan 2013 |
C/-hudson Gavin Martin, Level 8, 2 Commerce Street, Auckland 1010 | Physical | 07 Oct 2009 - 24 Jan 2013 |
C/-mgf Webb, Fairfax House, 110 Customs, Str West, Auckland, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 26 Jan 2009 - 07 Oct 2009 |
C/-hesketh Henry, Level 11, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland, New Zealand | Physical & registered | 29 Sep 2008 - 26 Jan 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Exp Holdings Luxembourg S.a.r.l. Other (Other) |
11 Mar 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Null - Expedia, Inc. Other |
29 Sep 2008 - 11 Mar 2016 | |
Null - Orbitz Worldwide, Inc Other |
11 Mar 2016 - 11 Mar 2016 | |
Null - Orbitz Worldwide, Llc Other |
11 Mar 2016 - 11 Mar 2016 | |
Expedia, Inc. Other |
29 Sep 2008 - 11 Mar 2016 | |
Orbitz Worldwide, Inc Other |
11 Mar 2016 - 11 Mar 2016 | |
Orbitz Worldwide, Llc Other |
11 Mar 2016 - 11 Mar 2016 |
Effective Date | 31 Oct 2019 |
Name | Expedia Group, Inc. |
Type | Corporation |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 91524515 |
Country of origin | US |
Djm Trustees No. 95 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Brookfields Lawyers Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Djm Trustees No. 94 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Djn Trustees No. 2 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Hpj Trustees No. 66 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Hpj Trustees No. 65 Limited Level 9, Tower One |