Djm Trustees No. 62 Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429032601695) was started on 15 Aug 2008. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 9, Tower One, 205 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). C/O Brookfields Lawyers, Level 11, 19 Victoria Street West, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 19 Dec 2013. 1 share is allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Brookfields Legal Services Limited (an entity) located at 205 Queen Street, Auckland postcode 1010. Businesscheck's database was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 9, Tower One, 205 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 19 Dec 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alison Claire Gilbert
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 12 Apr 2021 |
Director | 12 Apr 2021 - current |
Deborah Jane Miller
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 21 Apr 2021 |
Director | 21 Apr 2021 - 05 Sep 2022 |
Christopher Ogilvy Paterson
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 22 Apr 2021 |
Director | 22 Apr 2021 - 05 Sep 2022 |
Christopher Ogilvy Paterson
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 10 Dec 2019 |
Director | 10 Dec 2019 - 27 Apr 2021 |
Deborah Jane Miller
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 12 Aug 2015 |
Director | 08 Sep 2008 - 21 Apr 2021 |
Alison Claire Gilbert
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 07 May 2018 |
Director | 07 May 2018 - 21 Apr 2021 |
Howard Paul Johnston
Mangawhai, Wellsford, 0975
Address used since 16 Aug 2016 |
Director | 11 Sep 2008 - 01 Jul 2020 |
Harold Ian Martin Mccombe
Penrose, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 02 Sep 2014
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 13 Aug 2019 |
Director | 11 Sep 2008 - 09 Dec 2019 |
Harold Ian Martin Mccombe
Ellerslie, Auckland,
Address used since 15 Aug 2008 |
Director | 15 Aug 2008 - 08 Sep 2008 |
Howard Paul Johnston
Auckland,
Address used since 19 Aug 2008 |
Director | 19 Aug 2008 - 08 Sep 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/o Brookfields Lawyers, Level 11, 19 Victoria Street West, Auckland | Physical & registered | 15 Aug 2008 - 19 Dec 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brookfields Legal Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039139764 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
205 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
15 Aug 2008 - current |
Djm Trustees No. 95 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Brookfields Lawyers Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Djm Trustees No. 94 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Djn Trustees No. 2 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Hpj Trustees No. 66 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Hpj Trustees No. 65 Limited Level 9, Tower One |