Bean Rock Finance Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429032698978) was incorporated on 12 Jun 2008. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 30 The Esplanade, Eastern Beach, Auckland, 2012 (type: registered, physical). 5 The Parade, Bucklands Beach, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 05 Aug 2022. 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Kdhk Limited (an entity) located at Epsom, Auckland postcode 1051. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Riddell Trust Limited (an entity) - located at Kohimarama, Auckland 1071. The Businesscheck database was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
30 The Esplanade, Eastern Beach, Auckland, 2012 | Registered & physical & service | 05 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Darryl Raymond Keith Eastgate
Eastern Beach, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 05 Oct 2022
Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 14 Dec 2016 |
Director | 12 Jun 2008 - current |
Brett Frank Lornie
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 12 Jun 2008 |
Director | 12 Jun 2008 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5 The Parade, Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 | Physical & registered | 22 Dec 2016 - 05 Aug 2022 |
1 Cowie Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 17 Oct 2011 - 22 Dec 2016 |
Level 1, 99 Parnell Road, Auckland | Registered & physical | 12 Jun 2008 - 17 Oct 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kdhk Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034089965 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Epsom Auckland 1051 |
04 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Riddell Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032690453 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
04 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lornie, Bette Marland Individual |
Glendowie Auckland |
12 Jun 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Eastgate, Darryl Raymond Keith Individual |
99 Parnell Road Parnell, Auckland |
12 Jun 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Lornie, Brett Frank Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland |
12 Jun 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Eastgate, Karen Marie Individual |
99 Parnell Road Parnell, Auckland |
12 Jun 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Lornie, Ross Thomas Individual |
Glendowie Auckland |
12 Jun 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Certabuild Limited 3 The Parade |
|
Kexiao Consultancy Limited 15a Hattaway Avenue |
|
Tibetan Buddhism Basiba Foundation Charitable Trust 15a Hattaway Avenue |
|
Flower & Gift Cellar Limited 2/13 Hattaway Avenue |
|
Formula Enterprises Limited 10 B Hattaway Ave |
|
Foresite Trust Company Limited 21a Hattaway Avenue |