B & Jd Investments Limited (issued a business number of 9429032715866) was started on 03 Jun 2008. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 119 Parewanui Road, Bulls, 4894 (type: postal, office). 145 Miromiro Road, Normandale, Lower Hutt had been their registered address, up to 30 Jun 2017. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 999 shares (99.9 per cent of shares), namely:
Deihl, Bruce George (an individual) located at Bulls postcode 4894. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Deihl, Janet Susan (an individual) - located at Bulls. Our database was last updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level One, 61-63 Saint Lukes Road, Anz Bank Building, Saint Lukes, Auckland, 1025 | Physical & service | 03 Jun 2008 |
119 Parewanui Road, Bulls, 4894 | Registered | 30 Jun 2017 |
119 Parewanui Road, Bulls, 4894 | Postal & delivery | 13 Jun 2019 |
Level One, 61-63 Saint Lukes Road, Anz Bank Building, Saint Lukes, Auckland, 1025 | Office | 13 Jun 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Janet Susan Deihl
Bulls, 4894
Address used since 22 Jun 2017 |
Director | 03 Jun 2008 - current |
Bruce George Deihl
Bulls, 4894
Address used since 22 Jun 2017 |
Director | 03 Jun 2008 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level One, 61-63 Saint Lukes Road, Anz Bank Building, Saint Lukes, Auckland, 1025 | Office | 13 Jun 2019 |
Level One, 61-63 Saint Lukes Road , Anz Bank Building, Saint Lukes , Auckland , 1025 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
145 Miromiro Road, Normandale, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered | 24 Jun 2008 - 30 Jun 2017 |
L1, 61-63 St Lukes Road, (anz Bank Building), St Lukes, Auckland | Registered | 03 Jun 2008 - 24 Jun 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Deihl, Bruce George Individual |
Bulls 4894 |
03 Jun 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Deihl, Janet Susan Individual |
Bulls 4894 |
03 Jun 2008 - current |
Guinness Gallagher Corporate Advisory Limited 73 Taumaihi Street |
|
Mcnie Construction Limited 11b Pain Street |
|
Stonefire Limited 148 High Street |
|
Warbird Egress Systems NZ Limited 3 Pain Street |
|
Voluntary Trustees Limited 52 Johnson Street |
|
Bk Projects Limited 83 Johnson Street |