Moneyonline Limited (NZBN 9429032741254) was launched on 06 Jun 2008. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 8, 115 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: delivery, office). Level 7, 12-26 Swanson Street, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 14 Apr 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
King Capital & Investment Corporation Limited (an entity) located at 115 Queen Street, Auckland postcode 1010. "Internet publishing and broadcasting" (ANZSIC J570010) is the classification the ABS issued Moneyonline Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 1314, Shortland Street, Auckland, 1140 | Postal | 09 Aug 2019 |
Level 8, 115 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Apr 2021 |
Level 8, 115 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Delivery & office | 02 Jun 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brent Douglas King
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Sep 2022
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Aug 2019
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 28 Oct 2015 |
Director | 05 Dec 2012 - current |
Marvin Yee
Totara Vale, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 25 Oct 2012 |
Director | 25 Oct 2012 - 05 Dec 2012 |
Colin Craig Gardner
Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 25 Oct 2012 |
Director | 25 Oct 2012 - 05 Dec 2012 |
Brent Douglas King
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 06 Jun 2008 |
Director | 06 Jun 2008 - 20 Nov 2012 |
Level 8, 115 Queen Street , Auckland Central , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 7, 12-26 Swanson Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 19 Aug 2019 - 14 Apr 2021 |
Level7, 12-26 Swanson Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 05 Jul 2013 - 19 Aug 2019 |
18 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical | 17 Dec 2012 - 05 Jul 2013 |
18 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered | 17 Dec 2012 - 19 Aug 2019 |
Level 10, 20 Hobson Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 07 Mar 2011 - 17 Dec 2012 |
Level 13, 57 Fort Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 18 Aug 2008 - 07 Mar 2011 |
C/-chapman Tripp Sheffield Young, Level 35, 23-29 Albert Street, Auckland 1140 | Registered & physical | 06 Jun 2008 - 18 Aug 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
King Capital & Investment Corporation Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030414822 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
115 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
07 Dec 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Vet Equity Investment Advisers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032763805 Company Number: 2126827 Entity |
06 Jun 2008 - 07 Dec 2012 | |
Vet Equity Investment Advisers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032763805 Company Number: 2126827 Entity |
06 Jun 2008 - 07 Dec 2012 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | King Capital & Investment Corporation Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 4153558 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 7, 12-26 Swanson Street Auckland 1010 |
Crown Financial Services Nominees Limited 18 Amante Crescent |
|
Cybercom Hospitality Solutions Limited 18 Amante Crescent |
|
Omega Corporation Limited 18 Amante Crescent |
|
Platinum Electrical Limited 22 Amante Crescent |
|
Ko Olina Investments Limited 22 Amante Crescent |
|
Sch 2015 Limited 3 Theodora Place |
Electronic Publishing Limited Unit 13 |
Findaband Limited Flat 2, 55 Churchill Road |
Korean Iptv Limited Building B, 104 Rosedale Road |
Fantasy Sports Media Limited 162 Stapleford Crescent |
The Style Insider Limited 4a Te Kea Place |
Dahaus Limited 2/12 Greenvalley Rise |