Gumption Investments Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032742091) was started on 16 May 2008. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 12 Jacksons Road, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 (type: registered, physical). 26 Lewisham Park, Saint Albans, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 22 May 2017. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Sudell, Richard Clifford (an individual) located at Merivale, Christchurch postcode 8014. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
12 Jacksons Road, Merivale, Christchurch, 8014 | Registered & physical & service | 22 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard Clifford Sudell
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 12 May 2017 |
Director | 16 May 2008 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
26 Lewisham Park, Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8052 | Registered & physical | 07 Apr 2014 - 22 May 2017 |
33 Wood Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & physical | 07 May 2013 - 07 Apr 2014 |
Level 3, O'connell House, 13 O'connell Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 06 Apr 2011 - 07 May 2013 |
C/-richard Sudell, Level 4, 60 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland | Registered & physical | 16 May 2008 - 06 Apr 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sudell, Richard Clifford Individual |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 |
16 May 2008 - current |
Mul Management Limited 16a Jacksons Road |
|
Bill Parsons Trustee Limited 76 Fendalton Road |
|
Mont. Cooke Limited 29 Clifford Ave |
|
Koru Waters Of New Zealand Limited 19d Jacksons Road |
|
Hartismere Holdings Limited 87 Fendalton Road |
|
Rotary Club Of Bishopdale Burnside Charitable Trust 108 Harakeke Street |