Brok Dairies Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032796544) was launched on 13 May 2008. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 101 Don Street, Invercargill, 9810 (type: physical, registered). C/-Malloch Mcclean Limited, 45 Don Street, Invercargill had been their registered address, up until 28 Jan 2013. 1200 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.08% of shares), namely:
Van Vliet, Johanna Tryntje (an individual) located at Rd 3, Invercargill postcode 9893. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.08% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Brok, Jeroen Arnoldus (a director) - located at Rd 3, Invercargill. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (1198 shares, 99.83%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Brok, Jeroen Arnoldus, located at Rd 3, Invercargill (a director). "Milk production - dairy cattle" (ANZSIC A016020) is the classification the ABS issued to Brok Dairies Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 23 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
101 Don Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered & service | 28 Jan 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeroen Arnoldus Brok
Rd 3, Invercargill, 9893
Address used since 10 Jun 2022
Rd 1, Invercargill, 9871
Address used since 15 Jun 2016 |
Director | 13 May 2008 - current |
Jeroen Brok
Rd 1, Invercargill, 9871
Address used since 15 Jun 2016 |
Director | 13 May 2008 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-malloch Mcclean Limited, 45 Don Street, Invercargill | Registered & physical | 13 May 2008 - 28 Jan 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Vliet, Johanna Tryntje Individual |
Rd 3 Invercargill 9893 |
28 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brok, Jeroen Arnoldus Director |
Rd 3 Invercargill 9893 |
27 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brok, Jeroen Arnoldus Director |
Rd 3 Invercargill 9893 |
27 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brok, Jeroen Individual |
Rd 1 Invercargill 9871 |
13 May 2008 - 27 Apr 2022 |
Brok, Jeroen Individual |
Rd 1 Invercargill 9871 |
13 May 2008 - 27 Apr 2022 |
Titipua Management Company Limited 101 Don Street |
|
Southern Access Solutions Limited 101 Don Street |
|
Jkp Holdings (2013) Limited 101 Don Street |
|
Windsor Motors And Tyres Limited 101 Don Street |
|
Otago Mining Limited 101 Don Street |
|
Horizon Flowers NZ Limited 101 Don Street |
Duoreges Limited 101 Don Street |
Allison Family Farms Limited 101 Don Street |
Forest Hill Downs Limited 101 Don Street |
Manson Korowai Farms Limited 101 Don Street |
Derryvale Limited 101 Don Street |
Braewood Dairys Limited 101 Don Street |