Quaywest Panel & Paint Limited (issued a business number of 9429032823301) was registered on 28 Mar 2008. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 244 Tristram Street, Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 (type: registered, physical). 16 Boundary Road, Claudelands, Hamilton had been their registered address, until 24 Jan 2020. Quaywest Panel & Paint Limited used more aliases, namely: Soanes Autopainters Limited from 28 Mar 2008 to 16 Feb 2011. 100 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 78 shares (78% of shares), namely:
Bab Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Hamilton Central, Hamilton postcode 3204,
Quay, Wendy (an individual) located at Frankton, Hamilton postcode 3204,
Quay, Fraser (an individual) located at Frankton, Hamilton postcode 3204. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20% of all shares (20 shares); it includes
Amarasekera, Damian Ashley (an individual) - located at Western Heights, Hamilton. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Quay, Fraser, located at Frankton, Hamilton (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
244 Tristram Street, Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Jan 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Fraser Quay
Frankton, Hamilton, 3204
Address used since 07 Mar 2012 |
Director | 28 Mar 2008 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
16 Boundary Road, Claudelands, Hamilton, 3214 | Registered & physical | 16 Mar 2012 - 24 Jan 2020 |
C/-hemi Edwards Bartels Limited, Chartered Accountants, 16 Boundary Road, Hamilton | Registered & physical | 28 Mar 2008 - 16 Mar 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bab Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035365501 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Quay, Wendy Individual |
Frankton Hamilton 3204 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Quay, Fraser Individual |
Frankton Hamilton 3204 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Amarasekera, Damian Ashley Individual |
Western Heights Hamilton 3200 |
03 Oct 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Quay, Fraser Individual |
Frankton Hamilton 3204 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Quay, Wendy Individual |
Frankton Hamilton 3204 |
28 Mar 2008 - current |
Alcohol & Drug Community Support Trust C/o Hemi Edwards Bartels Limited |
|
Mark Allen Engineering Limited 29c Oakley Avenue |
|
Downbeat Systems Limited 6b Boundary Road |
|
Dental Hygiene Services Limited 15 Boundary Road |
|
Brella Projects Limited 26 Oakley Avenue |
|
Smart Waikato Trust 26 Oakley Avenue |