Djm Trustees No 54 Limited (NZBN 9429032834796) was started on 25 Mar 2008. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 9, Tower One, 205 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Level 11 19 Victoria St West, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 19 Dec 2013. 1 share is issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Brookfields Legal Services Limited (an entity) located at 205 Queen Street, Auckland postcode 1010. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
C/o Brookfields Lawyers, Level 9, Tower One, 205 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 11 Dec 2013 |
Level 9, Tower One, 205 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Dec 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Christopher Ogilvy Paterson
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 06 Jun 2019
Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 27 Jun 2014 |
Director | 27 Jun 2014 - current |
Deborah Jane Miller
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Jul 2014 |
Director | 01 Jul 2014 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Alison Claire Gilbert
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 10 Dec 2019 |
Director | 10 Dec 2019 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Howard Paul Johnston
Mangawhai, Wellsford, 0975
Address used since 14 Jun 2016 |
Director | 01 Jul 2014 - 23 Dec 2020 |
Harold Ian Martin Mccombe
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 06 Jun 2019
Penrose, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 02 Sep 2014 |
Director | 01 Jul 2014 - 09 Dec 2019 |
Deborah Jane Miller
Remuera, 1050
Address used since 25 Mar 2008 |
Director | 25 Mar 2008 - 27 Jun 2014 |
Howard Paul Johnston
Auckland,
Address used since 26 Mar 2008 |
Director | 26 Mar 2008 - 27 Jun 2014 |
Harold Ian Martin Mccombe
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 30 Aug 2013 |
Director | 26 Mar 2008 - 27 Jun 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 11 19 Victoria St West, Auckland | Registered & physical | 25 Mar 2008 - 19 Dec 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brookfields Legal Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039139764 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
205 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
25 Mar 2008 - current |
Djm Trustees No. 95 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Brookfields Lawyers Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Djm Trustees No. 94 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Djn Trustees No. 2 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Hpj Trustees No. 66 Limited Level 9, Tower One |
|
Hpj Trustees No. 65 Limited Level 9, Tower One |