Decipher Group Limited (NZBN 9429032887518) was incorporated on 28 Feb 2008. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 239, Christchurch, Christchurch, 8140 (type: postal, delivery). 12 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 16 Feb 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 49 shares (49% of shares), namely:
Bold Peak Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Addington, Christchurch postcode 8011. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Every, Sarcha Beulah (a director) - located at Scarborough, Christchurch. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (49 shares, 49%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Leanne Joy Crozier and Sarcha Beulah Every, located at Clifton, Christchurch (an other). "Employment placement service (candidates and contractors)" (business classification N721130) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Decipher Group Limited. Our database was updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
151 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Feb 2016 |
Po Box 239, Christchurch, Christchurch, 8140 | Postal | 03 Feb 2021 |
151 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch, 8013 | Delivery & office | 03 Feb 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sarcha Beulah Every
Scarborough, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 16 Jan 2018
83 Victoria Street, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 07 Sep 2015 |
Director | 28 Feb 2008 - current |
Leanne Crozier
Clifton, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 01 Jun 2017
Mt Pleasant, Christchurch 8081, 8081
Address used since 03 Feb 2016 |
Director | 28 Feb 2008 - current |
151 Cambridge Terrace , Christchurch , 8013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
12 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & registered | 10 Feb 2012 - 16 Feb 2016 |
6 La Mar Lane, Sumner, Christchurch, 8081 | Physical & registered | 16 Jul 2010 - 10 Feb 2012 |
Unit 6, Barry Hogan Place, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 24 Mar 2009 - 16 Jul 2010 |
38 Campbell Street, Sumner, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 28 Feb 2008 - 24 Mar 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bold Peak Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050062652 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Addington Christchurch 8011 |
31 Mar 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Every, Sarcha Beulah Director |
Scarborough Christchurch 8081 |
29 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leanne Joy Crozier And Sarcha Beulah Every Other (Other) |
Clifton Christchurch 8081 |
21 Aug 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Crozier, Leanne Individual |
Clifton Christchurch 8081 |
28 Feb 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Every, Sarcha Individual |
83 Victoria Street Christchurch 8013 |
28 Feb 2008 - 29 Aug 2016 |
Taitapu Partners Limited 151 Cambridge Terrace |
|
Grove Management Services Limited 151 Cambridge Terrace |
|
Simon Construction Limited 151 Cambridge Terrace |
|
Decipher Hr Limited 151 Cambridge Terrace |
|
Decipher Group Holdings Limited 151 Cambridge Terrace |
|
Praxisifm Trust (nz) Limited 151 Cambridge Terrace |
Stat Recruitment Pty Limited 1/48 Lismore Street |
The Talent Hive Limited 2/299 Durham Street |
Graham Consulting (auckland) Limited 52 Cashel Street |
Haven Legal Recruitment Limited Level 3, 148 Victoria Street |
Owr (2017) Limited 265 St Asaph Street |
Stat Recruitment Limited Unit 1/48 Lismore Street |