Hick Bros Heavy Haulage Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429032992472) was launched on 08 Jan 2008. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 146, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0944 (type: postal, office). Level 13, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland had been their registered address, until 03 Jun 2020. 30000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 30000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Hick Bros Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Silverdale, Silverdale postcode 0932. Our database was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
42 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Physical & registered & service | 03 Jun 2020 |
Po Box 146, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0944 | Postal | 02 Sep 2020 |
42 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Office & delivery | 02 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Anthony Cole
Rd 3, Riverhead, 0793
Address used since 02 Sep 2020
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 30 Oct 2013 |
Director | 08 Jan 2008 - current |
Carol Anne Campbell
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 06 Oct 2008 |
Director | 06 Oct 2008 - current |
Ernst Daniel Hohneck
Rd 2, Helensville, 0875
Address used since 01 Oct 2017 |
Director | 01 Oct 2017 - current |
Graham Brockway Darlow
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 01 Oct 2017 |
Director | 01 Oct 2017 - current |
Robert Bell Fenwick
Rd 3, Coatesville, 0793
Address used since 01 Sep 2022
Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932
Address used since 02 Sep 2020
Rd 1, Silverdale, 0994
Address used since 24 Jan 2017 |
Director | 02 Dec 2010 - 27 Jun 2024 |
Wayne Cecil Hick
Orewa, Auckland, 0931
Address used since 14 Sep 2015 |
Director | 08 Jan 2008 - 01 Oct 2015 |
Cherry Patricia Hick
Orewa, Auckland, 0931
Address used since 14 Sep 2015 |
Director | 06 Oct 2008 - 01 Oct 2015 |
Steven Francis Hick
Matakatia, Hibiscus Coast,
Address used since 05 Jun 2009 |
Director | 08 Jan 2008 - 28 Mar 2014 |
42 Forge Road , Silverdale , Silverdale , 0932 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 13, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered | 08 Jan 2008 - 03 Jun 2020 |
Level 13, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 08 Jan 2008 - 03 Jun 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hick Bros Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031359566 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 |
16 Dec 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Campbell, Carol Anne Individual |
St Heliers Auckland |
11 Nov 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Campbell, Carol Anne Individual |
St Heliers Auckland |
11 Nov 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Wayne Cecil Individual |
Orewa |
08 Jan 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Cole, Mark Anthony Individual |
Greenhithe North Shore City 0632 |
08 Jan 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Steven Francis Individual |
Matakatia Hibiscus Coast |
08 Jan 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Cole, Paula Maria Individual |
Greenhithe North Shore City 0632 |
11 Nov 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Reti Kathleen Individual |
Matakatia Hibiscus Coast |
11 Nov 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Cherry Patricia Individual |
Orewa |
11 Nov 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Parkinson, Paul Colin Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland |
11 Nov 2008 - 16 Dec 2010 |
S.c. Johnson & Son Proprietary Limited Level 8, 79 Queen St |
|
Nicholls & Maher (nz) Limited Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street |
|
D M Dunningham Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Mj Wyborn Ventures Limited Level 5, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |
|
Corvus Oteha Valley Joint Venture Limited Level 4, 52 Symonds Street |
|
Corvus New Zealand Limited Level 4, 52 Symonds Street |