Olsen Limited (issued a business number of 9429033027609) was incorporated on 19 Nov 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 402 Titirangi Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 (type: registered, physical). 317 Forest Hill Road, Waiatarua, Auckland had been their registered address, until 29 Nov 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 35 shares (35 per cent of shares), namely:
Olsen, Rolf Wahl (an individual) located at Oratia, Auckland. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 35 per cent of all shares (exactly 35 shares); it includes
Olsen, Sheila Wahl (an individual) - located at N/A, N/A. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (30 shares, 30%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Olsen, Sheila Wahl, located at N/A, N/A (an individual),
Olsen, Rolf Wahl, located at N/A, N/A (an individual). The Businesscheck database was updated on 07 Apr 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
402 Titirangi Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sheila Wahl Olsen
N/a, N/a, n/a
Address used since 21 Nov 2019
Titirangi, Waitakere, 0604
Address used since 17 Oct 2009
Waiatarua, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 05 Nov 2018 |
Director | 19 Nov 2007 - current |
Rolf Wahl Olsen
N/a, N/a, n/a
Address used since 21 Nov 2019
Titirangi, Waitakere, 0604
Address used since 17 Oct 2009
Waiatarua, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 05 Nov 2018 |
Director | 19 Nov 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
317 Forest Hill Road, Waiatarua, Auckland, 0612 | Registered & physical | 21 Dec 2015 - 29 Nov 2019 |
201 Shaw Road, Oratia, Auckland | Physical & registered | 19 Nov 2007 - 21 Dec 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Olsen, Rolf Wahl Individual |
Oratia Auckland |
19 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Olsen, Sheila Wahl Individual |
N/a N/a n/a |
19 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Olsen, Sheila Wahl Individual |
N/a N/a n/a |
19 Nov 2007 - current |
Olsen, Rolf Wahl Individual |
N/a N/a n/a |
19 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Teil Nominees (nz) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030864290 Company Number: 3676181 Entity |
08 Apr 2013 - 12 Feb 2014 | |
Ginger Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033478692 Company Number: 1929272 Entity |
19 Nov 2007 - 08 Apr 2013 | |
Ginger Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033478692 Company Number: 1929272 Entity |
19 Nov 2007 - 08 Apr 2013 | |
Teil Nominees (nz) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030864290 Company Number: 3676181 Entity |
08 Apr 2013 - 12 Feb 2014 |
Clough & Associates Limited 321 Forest Hill Road |
|
Cm Heritage Consulting Limited 321 Forest Hill Road |
|
Clyde Jackson Properties Limited 323 Forest Hill Road |
|
Sam Crest Limited 324 Forest Hill Road |
|
Forest Hill Vista Limited 346 Forest Hill Road |
|
Mingis Limited 309 Forest Hill Road |