Julway Trustee Company Limited (NZBN 9429033164571) was registered on 10 Sep 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 139 Stanners Road, Rd 2, Kerikeri, 0295 (type: registered, physical). Hupara Road, Pakaraka, Bay Of Islands had been their physical address, up until 13 Nov 2018. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 49 shares (49% of shares), namely:
Scott, Richard Wayne (an individual) located at Rd 2, Kerikeri postcode 0295. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 2% of all shares (exactly 2 shares); it includes
Shareholder Services Limited (an entity) - located at Kerikeri. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (49 shares, 49%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Scott, Julie Elizabeth, located at Rd 2, Kerikeri (an individual). Businesscheck's information was updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
139 Stanners Road, Rd 2, Kerikeri, 0295 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Nov 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Julie Elizabeth Scott
Rd 2, Kerikeri, 0295
Address used since 05 Nov 2018
Pakaraka, Kaikohe, 0472
Address used since 13 Oct 2015 |
Director | 10 Sep 2007 - current |
Richard Wayne Scott
Rd 2, Kerikeri, 0295
Address used since 05 Nov 2018
Pakaraka, Kaikohe, 0472
Address used since 13 Oct 2015 |
Director | 10 Sep 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Hupara Road, Pakaraka, Bay Of Islands | Physical & registered | 10 Sep 2007 - 13 Nov 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott, Richard Wayne Individual |
Rd 2 Kerikeri 0295 |
10 Sep 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Shareholder Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032734461 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Kerikeri |
01 Jul 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott, Julie Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 2 Kerikeri 0295 |
10 Sep 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dominick, Simon Individual |
Kerikeri |
10 Sep 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
He Iti Productions Limited 189 Hupara Road |
|
The Red Shed Limited 140 Hupara Road |
|
Tukau Limited 91 Hupara Road |
|
Tukau Law Limited 91 Hupara Road |
|
R & R Ferguson Limited 493 Hautapu Road |
|
Watledge Consulting (nz) Limited 574 Hautapu Road |