Rostrevor Trustees Six Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429033424705) was launched on 30 Apr 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 (type: physical, service). 1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton had been their physical address, up to 07 Aug 2018. 1 share is issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Victoria Street Master Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Whitiora, Hamilton postcode 3200. The Businesscheck database was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Registered | 26 Jun 2018 |
1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Physical & service | 07 Aug 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Glen Raymond Martyn
Huntington, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 19 Jun 2008 |
Director | 30 Apr 2007 - current |
Alison Ann Nation
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 01 Jan 2015 |
Director | 01 Jan 2015 - current |
Matthew Fulton
Rd 4, Hamilton, 3284
Address used since 29 Apr 2022
Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204
Address used since 02 Jun 2020
Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204
Address used since 01 Jan 2019 |
Director | 01 Jan 2019 - current |
Jamie Mark Powell
Raglan, 3225
Address used since 07 Feb 2024
Leamington, Cambridge, 3432
Address used since 25 Feb 2021 |
Director | 25 Feb 2021 - current |
Bernard Pierre Lamusse
Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 31 Jul 2015 |
Director | 30 Apr 2007 - 21 May 2020 |
Steven James Stark
Rd 2, Cambridge, 3494
Address used since 31 Jul 2015 |
Director | 01 Sep 2009 - 29 May 2018 |
Jane Elizabeth Evans
Tamahere, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 01 Sep 2015 |
Director | 01 Jan 2015 - 01 Apr 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Physical | 04 Jul 2012 - 07 Aug 2018 |
1026 Victoria Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Registered | 04 Jul 2012 - 26 Jun 2018 |
1st Floor, B D O Building, Cnr Rostrevor & Harwood Sts, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 15 Jul 2010 - 04 Jul 2012 |
B D O Spicers Hamilton, 1st Floor B D O Building, Cnr Harwood & Rostrevor Street, Hamilton | Physical & registered | 30 Apr 2007 - 15 Jul 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Victoria Street Master Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047698826 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whitiora Hamilton 3200 |
04 Oct 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pkf Hamilton Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037249366 Company Number: 1038131 Entity |
30 Apr 2007 - 04 Oct 2019 | |
Pkf Hamilton Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037249366 Company Number: 1038131 Entity |
Whitiora Hamilton 3200 |
30 Apr 2007 - 04 Oct 2019 |
Ikon Commercial Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Drainage Systems Auckland Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Freedom In Peace Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Zillkes Medical Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Distribution Gp Limited 1026 Victoria Street |
|
Firth Developments Limited 1026 Victoria Street |