Kaiser Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033606200) was started on 15 Feb 2007. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 46 Stanley Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). 11 Briar Vale Place, Flat Bush, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 27 Mar 2018. 1000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 300 shares (30 per cent of shares), namely:
Phekoo, Ashina (an individual) located at Bucklands Beach, Manukau postcode 2012,
Ashina Phekoo (a director) located at Bucklands Beach, Manukau postcode 2012. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 70 per cent of all shares (exactly 700 shares); it includes
Phekoo, Asha (an individual) - located at Bucklands Beach, Auckland. The Businesscheck database was updated on 14 Jun 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
11 Briar Vale Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 26 Apr 2013 |
11 Briar Vale Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Service & physical | 06 May 2013 |
Level 1, 46 Stanley Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 27 Mar 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Phekoo Ashina
Bucklands Beach, Manukau, 2012
Address used since 20 Jan 2010 |
Director | 15 Feb 2007 - current |
Asha Phekoo
Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 05 Aug 2020 |
Director | 05 Aug 2020 - current |
Ashina Phekoo
Bucklands Beach, Manukau, 2012
Address used since 20 Jan 2010 |
Director | 15 Feb 2007 - 04 Mar 2021 |
Phekoo Vinod
Bucklands Beach, Manukau, 2012
Address used since 20 Jan 2010 |
Director | 15 Feb 2007 - 01 Mar 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
11 Briar Vale Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Registered | 06 May 2013 - 27 Mar 2018 |
34 Cranberry Place, Howick, Auckland | Physical & registered | 15 Feb 2007 - 06 May 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Phekoo, Ashina Individual |
Bucklands Beach Manukau 2012 |
10 Aug 2020 - current |
Ashina Phekoo Director |
Bucklands Beach Manukau 2012 |
10 Aug 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Phekoo, Asha Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 |
16 Mar 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ashina, Phekoo Individual |
Howick Auckland |
15 Feb 2007 - 10 Aug 2020 |
Vinod, Phekoo Individual |
Howick Auckland |
15 Feb 2007 - 16 Mar 2018 |
Nestle New Zealand Limited Level 3, 12-16 Nicholls Lane |
|
Md Nayeem Investments Limited Level 1, 46 Stanley Street |
|
Bermich Limited Level 1, 46 Stanley Street |
|
Little Buddy Pt Limited Level 1, 46 Stanley Street |
|
Resh Investments Limited Level 1, 46 Stanley Street |
|
Vitality Holdings Limited Level 1, 46 Stanley Street |