Online Sales Limited (NZBN 9429033610177) was launched on 12 Feb 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 46B Kenmure Road, Belleknowes, Dunedin, 9011 (type: registered, physical). 6Th Floor Consultancy House, 7 Bond Street, Dunedin had been their registered address, until 27 Feb 2019. Online Sales Limited used more names, namely: Watchsale Limited from 12 Feb 2007 to 26 Jul 2013. 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Frame, Rachael Lynn (an individual) located at Belleknowes, Dunedin 9011. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Frame, David Robin (an individual) - located at Belleknowes, Dunedin. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (98 shares, 98%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
David Robin Frame, located at Belleknowes, Dunedin (an other),
Webb Farry Limited, located at Dunedin (an other),
Rachael Lynn Frame, located at Belleknowes, Dunedin (an other). The Businesscheck information was updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
46b Kenmure Road, Belleknowes, Dunedin, 9011 | Service & physical | 30 Sep 2008 |
46b Kenmure Road, Belleknowes, Dunedin, 9011 | Registered | 27 Feb 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rachael Lynn Frame
Belleknowes, Dunedin, 9011
Address used since 23 Sep 2008 |
Director | 12 Feb 2007 - current |
David Robin Frame
Belleknowes, Duedin, 9011
Address used since 31 Mar 2014 |
Director | 31 Mar 2014 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6th Floor Consultancy House, 7 Bond Street, Dunedin, 9015 | Registered | 25 Feb 2015 - 27 Feb 2019 |
46b Kenmure Road, Belleknowes, Dunedin 9011 | Registered | 30 Sep 2008 - 25 Feb 2015 |
46b Kenmure Road, Belleknowes, Dunedin | Physical & registered | 12 Feb 2007 - 30 Sep 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frame, Rachael Lynn Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin 9011 |
12 Feb 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frame, David Robin Individual |
Belleknowes Dunedin |
01 Apr 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
David Robin Frame Other (Other) |
Belleknowes Dunedin |
01 Apr 2010 - current |
Webb Farry Limited Other (Other) |
Dunedin |
01 Apr 2010 - current |
Rachael Lynn Frame Other (Other) |
Belleknowes Dunedin |
01 Apr 2010 - current |
Victoria Railway Hotel Management Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |
|
Victoria Railway Hotel Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |
|
Universal Healthcare Holdings Limited Level 6 |
|
Jam Corporate Trustees Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |
|
Get Up & Go Property Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |
|
Get Up & Go Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |