Bradburn Project Management Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033625898) was started on 13 Feb 2007. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 30 Tilden Avenue, Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 (type: office, registered). 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their physical address, until 20 Apr 2018. 1200 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 1198 shares (99.83% of shares), namely:
Bradburn Independent Trustee Limited (an entity) located at 34 Triton Drive, Auckland postcode 0632,
Bradburn, Dominic John (an individual) located at Belmont, Auckland postcode 0622. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.17% of all shares (2 shares); it includes
Bradburn, Dominic (an individual) - located at Belmont, Auckland. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
30 Tilden Avenue, Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627 | Office | unknown |
470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Other (Address for Records) | 03 Sep 2012 |
Building C, 34 Triton Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 12 Apr 2018 |
Building C, 34 Triton Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Apr 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dominic Bradburn
Belmnt, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 25 Feb 2020
Hillcrest, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 03 Sep 2012
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 27 Sep 2018 |
Director | 13 Feb 2007 - current |
Type | Used since |
---|
30 Tilden Avenue , Hillcrest , Auckland , 0627 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical | 23 Apr 2013 - 20 Apr 2018 |
470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 18 Mar 2013 - 20 Apr 2018 |
470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 11 Sep 2012 - 18 Mar 2013 |
470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical | 11 Sep 2012 - 23 Apr 2013 |
5 William Laurie Place, Albany, North Shore City, 0632 | Registered & physical | 17 May 2011 - 11 Sep 2012 |
4 Picton Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 16 Jan 2009 - 17 May 2011 |
31 Maxwelton Drive, Mairangi Bay, North Shore City | Registered & physical | 17 May 2007 - 16 Jan 2009 |
1/433a East Coast Road, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical | 13 Feb 2007 - 17 May 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bradburn Independent Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032612813 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
34 Triton Drive Auckland 0632 |
06 Oct 2009 - current |
Bradburn, Dominic John Individual |
Belmont Auckland 0622 |
06 Oct 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bradburn, Dominic Individual |
Belmont Auckland 0622 |
13 Feb 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bradburn, Rachel Anne Individual |
Hillcrest Auckland 0627 |
20 Oct 2016 - 28 Sep 2018 |
Smedley Future Limited 18 Tilden Avenue |
|
Glendowie Ventures Limited 38 Tilden Avenue |
|
Glendowie Consultancy Services Limited 38 Tilden Avenue |
|
Lj X Trustee Limited 9 Tilden Avenue |
|
Mc2012 Properties Limited 47 Moore Street |
|
Thompson Carpets Limited 62a Pupuke Road |