Byrne Equity Holdings Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033662800) was started on 18 Jan 2007. 7 addresess are in use by the company: 100 Burnett Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 (type: registered, service). 208 Havelock Street, Ashburton, Ashburton had been their registered address, up until 10 Mar 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Byrne, Samuel James (an individual) located at Ashburton. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
208 Havelock Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 01 Mar 2022 |
208 Havelock Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Mar 2022 |
100 Burnett Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 | Records | 10 Jun 2024 |
100 Burnett Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & service | 18 Jun 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Peter Byrne
93 Walnut Avenue, Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 10 Mar 2010 |
Director | 03 Jul 2008 - current |
Kathleen Maria Byrne
93 Walnut Avenue, Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 10 Mar 2010 |
Director | 03 Jul 2008 - current |
Samuel James Byrne
Ashburton,
Address used since 18 Jan 2007 |
Director | 18 Jan 2007 - 03 Jul 2008 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
100 Burnett Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & service | 18 Jun 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
208 Havelock Street, Ashburton, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & physical | 22 Mar 2019 - 10 Mar 2022 |
Flat 2, 93 Walnut Avenue, Allenton, Ashburton, 7700 | Physical & registered | 02 Mar 2018 - 22 Mar 2019 |
144 Tancred Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & physical | 17 May 2017 - 02 Mar 2018 |
Shantagh, 73 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & physical | 17 Dec 2014 - 17 May 2017 |
C/-davidson & Associates Limited, Level 6, 182 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered | 10 Jul 2008 - 17 Dec 2014 |
Davison & Associates Ltd, L6, 182 Broadway, Newmarket | Registered | 14 May 2008 - 10 Jul 2008 |
Davidson & Associates Ltd, L6, 182 Broadway, Newmarket | Physical | 14 May 2008 - 17 Dec 2014 |
Acorn Solutions Limited, 42 Apollo Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland | Physical & registered | 18 Jan 2007 - 14 May 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Byrne, Samuel James Individual |
Ashburton |
18 Jan 2007 - current |
Ashburton Gospel Trust 105 Walnut Avenue |
|
Mid Canterbury Cricket Trust 36 Queens Drive |
|
John Lane Scholarship Fund 36 Queens Drive |
|
Grey Hills Consulting Limited 1 Trellech Place |
|
Parthenon Construction Limited 1 Trellech Place |
|
Consultancy Services Limited 117 Pages Rd |