Umbrella Group Limited (issued a business number of 9429033673158) was launched on 08 Jan 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 341 Mackenzies Road, Rd 3, Amberley, 7483 (type: physical, registered). Unit 1B, 303 Blenheim Road, Middleton, Christchurch had been their registered address, up until 19 Mar 2014. 100 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 48 shares (48% of shares), namely:
Diversity Limited (an entity) located at Waipara, North Canterbury postcode 7447. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Kepes, Benjamin Paul (an individual) - located at Waipara,
Griffith-Jones, Paula (an individual) - located at Rangiora,
Griffith-Jones, Guy (an individual) - located at Rangiora. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Kepes, Benjamin Paul, located at Waipara (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
341 Mackenzies Road, Rd 3, Amberley, 7483 | Physical & registered & service | 19 Mar 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Benjamin Paul Kepes
Waipara, 7447
Address used since 01 Mar 2016 |
Director | 08 Jan 2007 - current |
Guy Griffith-jones
Rangiora, 7475
Address used since 01 Mar 2016 |
Director | 08 Jan 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 1b, 303 Blenheim Road, Middleton, Christchurch, 8041 | Registered & physical | 05 Apr 2013 - 19 Mar 2014 |
165 Lichfield Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 08 Jan 2007 - 05 Apr 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Diversity Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033044095 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Waipara North Canterbury 7447 |
12 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kepes, Benjamin Paul Individual |
Waipara |
08 Jan 2007 - current |
Griffith-jones, Paula Individual |
Rangiora |
08 Jan 2007 - current |
Griffith-jones, Guy Individual |
Rangiora |
08 Jan 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kepes, Benjamin Paul Individual |
Waipara |
27 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kepes, Vivien Individual |
Waipara |
27 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kepes, Vivien Frances Individual |
Waipara |
08 Jan 2007 - 12 Nov 2007 |
Waipara Gardens Country Store Limited 277 Mackenzies Road |
|
Emuology Limited 277 Mackenzies Road |
|
Amberley Christian Church Trust 27 Mackenzies Road |
|
Tomsoffroad And Customs Limited 7 Mackenzies Road |
|
Waipara Fireworks Incorporated 3 Ferguson Avenue |
|
Mamod (nz) Limited 108 Mackenzies Rd |