Matakana Taxis Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033696317) was registered on 15 Dec 2006. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 14 Kawau View Road, Snells Beach, 0920 (type: postal, office). 14 Kawau View Road, Snells Beach had been their physical address, until 08 Aug 2014. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Bradburn, Deborah Jane (an individual) located at Snells Beach, Warkworth postcode 0920,
Bradburn, Murray Harold (an individual) located at Snells Beach, Warkworth postcode 0920. "Taxi cab service" (ANZSIC I462330) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Matakana Taxis Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
14 Kawau View Road, Snells Beach, 0920 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Aug 2014 |
14 Kawau View Road, Snells Beach, 0920 | Postal & office & delivery | 31 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Deborah Jane Bradburn
Snells Beach, Auckland, 0920
Address used since 13 Jul 2015 |
Director | 14 Oct 2008 - current |
Murray Harold Bradburn
Snells Beach, Auckland, 0920
Address used since 13 Jul 2015 |
Director | 14 Oct 2008 - current |
Sandy Mcneur
Matakana,0948,
Address used since 20 Jul 2007 |
Director | 15 Dec 2006 - 14 Nov 2008 |
14 Kawau View Road , Snells Beach , Snells Beach , 0920 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
14 Kawau View Road, Snells Beach | Physical | 02 Dec 2008 - 08 Aug 2014 |
14 Kawau View Road, Snells Beach, Warkworth | Registered | 02 Dec 2008 - 08 Aug 2014 |
2 Pompallier Terrace,ponsonby, Auckland | Registered & physical | 15 Dec 2006 - 02 Dec 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bradburn, Deborah Jane Individual |
Snells Beach Warkworth 0920 |
25 Nov 2008 - current |
Bradburn, Murray Harold Individual |
Snells Beach Warkworth 0920 |
25 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcneur, Sandy Individual |
St Marys Bay |
15 Dec 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Matakabs Limited 14 Kawau View Road |
|
Camgarkim Limited 14 Kawau View Road |
|
Matakana Coast Builders Limited 14 Kawau View Road |
|
South Pacific Marine Limited North Cove |
|
Kowhai Art & Craft Incorporated 20 Snells Beach Road |
|
Peter Vegar Trust Limited 369 Mahurangi East Road |
Matakabs Limited 14 Kawau View Road |
Executive Pro Cleaning Services Limited 958 East Coast Road |
Dk Enterprise (nz) Limited 82 Medallion Drive |
Rpr Limited 90 Nigel Road |
Njt Limited Unit 2, 100 Bush Road |
Haley Enterprises Limited 16 Tesla Place |