Gal Trustees 07 Limited (issued a business number of 9429033722702) was registered on 22 Dec 2006. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Arl Lawyers House, 19 Cornwall Street, Lower Hutt, 5010 (type: registered, physical). Avison Reid Lawyers House, 119 Queens Drive, Lower Hutt 5040 had been their registered address, up to 20 Dec 2010. 120 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 60 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Dickie, Rebecca Rachael (an individual) located at Waterloo, Lower Hutt postcode 5011. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25% of all shares (exactly 30 shares); it includes
Sheehan, Benedict John Joseph (an individual) - located at Lower Hutt. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allotment (30 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Avison, Ian Stewart, located at Point Howard, Lower Hutt (an individual). Our database was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Arl Lawyers House, 19 Cornwall Street, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Dec 2010 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian Stewart Avison
Point Howard, Lower Hutt, 5013
Address used since 01 Oct 2013 |
Director | 22 Dec 2006 - current |
Benedict John Joseph Sheehan
Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 14 Mar 2016 |
Director | 22 Dec 2006 - current |
Rebecca Rachael Dickie
Waterloo, Lower Hutt, 5011
Address used since 01 Oct 2014 |
Director | 01 Jan 2009 - current |
Paul Gregory Logan
Point Howard, Eastbourne, 5013
Address used since 22 Dec 2006 |
Director | 22 Dec 2006 - 31 Mar 2023 |
Sarah Margaret Morrison
Belmont, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 06 Mar 2018 |
Director | 06 Mar 2018 - 23 Oct 2019 |
Paul Robert Cheyne Reid
Rd 2, Carterton, 5792
Address used since 16 Feb 2010 |
Director | 22 Dec 2006 - 31 Oct 2015 |
Mervyn Alexander Gaskin
Heretaunga, Upper Hutt,
Address used since 22 Dec 2006 |
Director | 22 Dec 2006 - 24 Jan 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Avison Reid Lawyers House, 119 Queens Drive, Lower Hutt 5040 | Registered | 18 Feb 2008 - 20 Dec 2010 |
Avison Reid Lawyers House, 119 Queens Drive, Lower Hutt 5010 | Physical | 18 Feb 2008 - 20 Dec 2010 |
Gaskin Avison House, 119 Queens Drive, Lower Hutt | Physical & registered | 22 Dec 2006 - 18 Feb 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dickie, Rebecca Rachael Individual |
Waterloo Lower Hutt 5011 |
05 Jan 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sheehan, Benedict John Joseph Individual |
Lower Hutt |
22 Dec 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Avison, Ian Stewart Individual |
Point Howard Lower Hutt 5013 |
22 Dec 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reid, Paul Robert Cheyne Individual |
Carterton |
22 Dec 2006 - 14 Mar 2016 |
Gaskin, Mervyn Alexander Individual |
Heretaunga Upper Hutt |
22 Dec 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Logan, Paul Gregory Individual |
Point Howard Eastbourne |
22 Dec 2006 - 04 Apr 2023 |
Arl Solomon Trust Limited Arl Lawyers House |
|
Arl Studd Trust Limited Arl Lawyers House |
|
Arl Penn Trust Limited Arl Lawyers House |
|
Arl Lewis Trust Limited Arl Lawyers House |
|
Arl Osborne Trust Limited Arl Lawyers House |
|
Arl Makan Trust Limited Arl Lawyers House |