Mat Nominee Company Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033739090) was started on 06 Dec 2006. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 11 Stanners Street, Eltham, Eltham, 4322 (type: registered, physical). Stanners Street, Eltham had been their physical address, up until 28 Sep 2016. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Schurr and Ireland Nominees Limited (an entity) located at Eltham, Eltham postcode 4322. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
G/M Nominees Limited (an entity) - located at Stratford. "Nominee service" (ANZSIC K641935) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Mat Nominee Company Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
11 Stanners Street, Eltham, Eltham, 4322 | Registered & physical & service | 28 Sep 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Roderick Ian Gordon
Stratford, Stratford, 4332
Address used since 12 Oct 2011
Stratford, Stratford, 4332
Address used since 12 Oct 2011 |
Director | 06 Dec 2006 - current |
Scott Peter Ireland
Merrilands, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 10 Jun 2021 |
Director | 10 Jun 2021 - current |
Floyd Harrison Wicksteed
New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 10 Jun 2021 |
Director | 10 Jun 2021 - current |
Ken Bruce Vazey
New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 10 Jun 2021 |
Director | 10 Jun 2021 - current |
Christopher Frederick Schurr
New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 12 Oct 2015 |
Director | 06 Dec 2006 - 24 May 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Stanners Street, Eltham | Physical & registered | 06 Dec 2006 - 28 Sep 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Schurr And Ireland Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042488071 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Eltham Eltham 4322 |
10 Jun 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
G/m Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037536992 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Stratford 4332 |
06 Dec 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Schurr, Christopher Frederick Individual |
New Plymouth |
06 Dec 2006 - 10 Jun 2021 |
Tern And Teal Trustee Company Limited 11 Stanners Street |
|
Bushline Trustees Limited 11 Stanners Street |
|
Metal Pink Limited 11 Stanners Street |
|
Agt Milk Co Limited 11 Stanners Street |
|
Eltham Dental Centre (2013) Limited 11 Stanners Street |
|
G D & W G Pitman Trustee Limited 11 Stanners Street |
Tern And Teal Trustee Company Limited 11 Stanners Street |
Bushline Trustees Limited 11 Stanners Street |
T-bone Trustees Limited 11 Stanners Street |
D & D Coupe Trustee Limited 11 Stanners Street |
Price Family Trust Nominees Limited 11 Stanners Street |
Active Development Nominees Limited 11 Stanners Street |