Jcm Trustees No.1 Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033772394) was registered on 02 Nov 2006. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 23 Brown Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical). 23 Brown Street, Tauranga, Tauranga had been their physical address, up to 14 Jul 2021. 120 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 40 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Browne, Peter Russ (a director) located at Matua, Tauranga postcode 3110. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (40 shares); it includes
Song, Zhaopan (a director) - located at Maungatapu, Tauranga. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (40 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Manning, Jason Carl Manaia, located at Pyes Pa, Tauranga (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 07 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Manning Warner Browne Limited, 141 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 16 Nov 2012 |
23 Brown Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jason Carl Manaia Manning
Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 21 Jun 2016 |
Director | 02 Nov 2006 - current |
Peter Russ Browne
Matua, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 31 Mar 2017 |
Director | 31 Mar 2017 - current |
Zhaopan Song
Maungatapu, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 09 Nov 2022
Rd 4, Matata, 3194
Address used since 23 Nov 2021
Maungatapu, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 03 Apr 2017 |
Director | 03 Apr 2017 - current |
Virginia Joy Warner
Bellevue, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 03 Dec 2008 |
Director | 02 Nov 2006 - 23 Oct 2020 |
Leslie Brian Dawson
Tauranga,
Address used since 02 Nov 2006 |
Director | 02 Nov 2006 - 01 Dec 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
23 Brown Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 14 Oct 2019 - 14 Jul 2021 |
141 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 26 Nov 2012 - 14 Oct 2019 |
L B Dawson & Associates Ltd, Chartered, Accountants, First Floor, 126, Eleventh Ave, Tauranga 3110 | Registered & physical | 10 Dec 2008 - 26 Nov 2012 |
L B Dawson & Associates Limited, Chartered Accountants, First Floor, 126 Eleventh Ave, Tauranga | Physical & registered | 02 Nov 2006 - 10 Dec 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Browne, Peter Russ Director |
Matua Tauranga 3110 |
28 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Song, Zhaopan Director |
Maungatapu Tauranga 3112 |
28 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Manning, Jason Carl Manaia Individual |
Pyes Pa Tauranga 3112 |
02 Nov 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Warner, Virginia Joy Individual |
Bellevue Tauranga 3110 |
02 Nov 2006 - 28 Oct 2020 |
Dawson, Leslie Brian Individual |
Tauranga |
02 Nov 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Michael And Kathy Sass Limited 141 Cameron Road |
|
Kiwiclog's Dustbusters Limited 141 Cameron Road |
|
Rowan Tree Charitable Trust Manning Warner |
|
Sadgrove Charitable Trust Manning Warner |
|
Zanz Limited Partnership Manning Warner Browne Limited |