Espy Media Group Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429033795720) was incorporated on 30 Oct 2006. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Unit 8, 36 Sale Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). 72 College Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 07 Dec 2012. 1000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 510 shares (51% of shares), namely:
Espy Group Limited (an entity) located at Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland postcode 0610. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 24.5% of all shares (exactly 245 shares); it includes
G & G Media Limited (an entity) - located at Orakei, Auckland. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (245 shares, 24.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Rowell, Andre, located at Laingholm, Auckland (an individual). "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (ANZSIC K624030) is the classification the ABS issued to Espy Media Group Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 23 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 8, 36 Sale Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 07 Dec 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Timothy Dillan Lawrence
Te Atatu, Auckland, 0610
Address used since 30 Oct 2006 |
Director | 30 Oct 2006 - current |
Andre Rowell
Laingholm, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 05 Feb 2016 |
Director | 15 Nov 2006 - current |
Greg Sinclair
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 08 Feb 2022
Sandringham, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 14 Feb 2017 |
Director | 15 Nov 2006 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
72 College Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered & physical | 13 May 2008 - 07 Dec 2012 |
Level 1, 63 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland 1011 | Registered & physical | 30 Oct 2006 - 13 May 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Espy Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037905392 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Te Atatu Peninsula Auckland 0610 |
02 Nov 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
G & G Media Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038113208 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
20 Dec 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rowell, Andre Individual |
Laingholm Auckland 0604 |
20 Dec 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Espy Network Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037367497 Company Number: 1014735 Entity |
30 Oct 2006 - 02 Nov 2011 | |
Espy Network Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037367497 Company Number: 1014735 Entity |
30 Oct 2006 - 02 Nov 2011 |
Blue Snow Limited Unit 1, 36 Sale Street |
|
M 2 Magazine Uk Limited Unit 8 |
|
M 2 Magazine Limited Unit 8 |
|
My Cloud Bench Limited Unit 1, 36 Sale Street |
|
Platypus Shoes Limited Shed 15, 1-3 City Works Depot |
|
Accent Group Limited Shed 15, 1-3 City Works Depot |
Les Mills India Lp Limited 22 Centre Street |
Conner Holdings (2009) Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street, Auckland |
Pioneer Capital Ii Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
Pioneer Capital (gp Ii) Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
Kmm Trustee Company Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
Icf Holdings (nz) Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |