Vagos 2018 Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033956626) was started on 01 Aug 2006. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 153 Salisbury Road, North Taieri, Mosgiel, 9092 (type: registered, physical). 464 Taioma Road, Mosgiel had been their registered address, until 09 Sep 2020. Vagos 2018 Limited used more aliases, namely: Bugs Off Limited from 31 Jan 2008 to 05 Sep 2018, Totally Spoilt Limited (01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jan 2008). 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Smith, Victoria Louise (an individual) located at North Taieri, Mosgiel postcode 9092. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Oaten, Glynn Desmond (an individual) - located at North Taieri, Mosgiel. Our database was last updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
C/-nextstep, 4 Park Street, Queenstown | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 01 Aug 2006 |
153 Salisbury Road, North Taieri, Mosgiel, 9092 | Registered & physical & service | 09 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Victoria Louise Smith
North Taieri, Dunedin, 9092
Address used since 01 Sep 2020
North Dunedin, Dunedin, 9016
Address used since 20 Jun 2012 |
Director | 01 Aug 2006 - current |
Glynn Desmond Oaten
North Taieri, Dunedin, 9092
Address used since 01 Sep 2020
North Dunedin, Dunedin, 9016
Address used since 20 Jun 2012 |
Director | 25 Jan 2008 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
464 Taioma Road, Mosgiel, 9092 | Registered & physical | 13 Sep 2018 - 09 Sep 2020 |
177 Leith Street, North Dunedin, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 28 Jun 2012 - 13 Sep 2018 |
1562 West Coast Road, West Melton Rd1, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 01 Feb 2008 - 28 Jun 2012 |
1 Chislehurst Place, Fendalton, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 08 May 2007 - 01 Feb 2008 |
15 Hawthornden Road, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 01 Aug 2006 - 08 May 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Victoria Louise Individual |
North Taieri Mosgiel 9092 |
01 Aug 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oaten, Glynn Desmond Individual |
North Taieri Mosgiel 9092 |
25 Jan 2008 - current |
Dunedin Taxis Limited 177 Leith Street |
|
Taxis Dunedin Limited 177 Leith Street |
|
Dunedin City Taxis Limited 177 Leith Street |
|
Dunedin Taxis (1965) Limited 177 Leith Street |
|
Cowells Pavlova Kitchen Dunedin Limited 7 Vire Street |
|
Zenrx Limited 156 Frederick Street |