Fedamast Farms Limited (NZBN 9429033978031) was started on 20 Jul 2006. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 20 Arawa Street, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 (type: physical, registered). C/-Kim Hancock Limited, Chartered Accountant, 8 Tainui Street, Matamata 3400 had been their registered address, until 20 Jun 2013. 120 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 118 shares (98.33% of shares), namely:
Cg Trustee 2024 Limited (an entity) located at Matamata postcode 3400,
Wyatt, Fiona Helen (an individual) located at Rd 1, Brunswick postcode 4571,
Wyatt, Darren Woods (an individual) located at Rd 1, Brunswick postcode 4571. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.83% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Wyatt, Darren Woods (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Brunswick. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.83%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Wyatt, Fiona Helen, located at Rd 1, Brunswick (an individual). Our data was last updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Arawa Street, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 | Physical & registered & service | 20 Jun 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Fiona Helen Wyatt
Rd 1, Brunswick, 4571
Address used since 20 Jun 2024
Rd 1, Wanganui, 4571
Address used since 04 Jun 2010 |
Director | 20 Jul 2006 - current |
Darren Woods Wyatt
Rd 1, Brunswick, 4571
Address used since 20 Jun 2024
Rd 1, Wanganui, 4571
Address used since 04 Jun 2010 |
Director | 20 Jul 2006 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-kim Hancock Limited, Chartered Accountant, 8 Tainui Street, Matamata 3400 | Registered & physical | 14 Jun 2010 - 20 Jun 2013 |
Kim Hancock Limited, Tainui Street, Matamata | Physical & registered | 20 Jul 2006 - 14 Jun 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cg Trustee 2024 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051819125 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Matamata 3400 |
08 Aug 2024 - current |
Wyatt, Fiona Helen Individual |
Rd 1 Brunswick 4571 |
20 Jul 2006 - current |
Wyatt, Darren Woods Individual |
Rd 1 Brunswick 4571 |
20 Jul 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wyatt, Darren Woods Individual |
Rd 1 Brunswick 4571 |
20 Jul 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wyatt, Fiona Helen Individual |
Rd 1 Brunswick 4571 |
20 Jul 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hancock, Kim Bruce Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
20 Jul 2006 - 08 Aug 2024 |
Becks Nurseries 1998 Limited 20 Arawa Street, Matamata |
|
Stanlyn Hardware Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Richard Wine Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Shaune Ritchie Racing Limited 20 Arawa Street, Matamata |
|
Cyh Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Nickel Builders Limited 20 Arawa Street |