Arlidge Holdings Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429034096451) was launched on 23 May 2006. 8 addresess are currently in use by the company: 156A Penrose Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 (type: registered, service). Level 3, 27 Bath Street, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 06 Jul 2016. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 95 shares (95 per cent of shares), namely:
Arlidge, Robert John (an individual) located at Mt Wellington, Auckland. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 5 per cent of all shares (5 shares); it includes
Arlidge, Michelle Margaret (an individual) - located at Mt Wellington, Auckland. Our information was last updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 27 Bath Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Jul 2016 |
Level 5, 32-34 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & service | 21 Jun 2023 |
Level 5, 32-34 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 01 Aug 2023 |
156a Penrose Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Registered & service | 08 Jul 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michelle Margaret Arlidge
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 22 Sep 2009 |
Director | 23 May 2006 - current |
Robert John Arlidge
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 22 Sep 2009 |
Director | 23 May 2006 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
156a Penrose Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Registered & service | 08 Jul 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 27 Bath Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 12 Nov 2015 - 06 Jul 2016 |
139 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical | 22 Aug 2008 - 12 Nov 2015 |
Level 11, Tower One, 51/53 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 23 May 2006 - 22 Aug 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Arlidge, Robert John Individual |
Mt Wellington Auckland |
23 May 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Arlidge, Michelle Margaret Individual |
Mt Wellington Auckland |
23 May 2006 - current |
The Fusion Group Limited Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace |
|
Crp & Njp Investments Limited Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace |
|
Tfa Crp & Njp Trustee Limited Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace |
|
Reflection Treatment Systems Limited Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace |
|
Ledlight Limited Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace |
|
Tfa Coulthard Miller Trustee Limited Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace |