Sw Trust Services (Six) Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034132517) was started on 25 May 2006. 10 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 4, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (type: service, registered). Level 3, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland had been their service address, until 14 May 2024. 80 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 80 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Sw Trust Services (Holdings) Limited (an entity) located at Takapuna, Auckland postcode 0622. Our data was updated on 10 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
C/-simpson Western, Level 17, Aia House, 5-7 Byron Ave, Takapuna, Auckland | Other (Address For Share Register) | 25 May 2006 |
C/-simpson Western, Level 3, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Records & other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister | 18 Jul 2017 |
Level 3, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Physical & registered | 26 Jul 2017 |
Level 3, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Postal | 04 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robert Alan Clark
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 03 May 2010 |
Director | 25 May 2006 - current |
Kenneth James Paterson
Milford, North Shore City, 0620
Address used since 02 May 2011 |
Director | 02 May 2011 - current |
Candice Maria Murphy
Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 27 Jul 2021 |
Director | 27 Jul 2021 - current |
Jamie Matthew Barr
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 27 Jul 2021 |
Director | 27 Jul 2021 - current |
Barton Alistair Hoggard
Milford, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 01 Apr 2023 |
Director | 01 Apr 2023 - current |
Gary Graeme Simpson
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 20 Nov 2020
Campbells Bay, North Shore City, 0630
Address used since 01 Aug 2006 |
Director | 25 May 2006 - 01 Apr 2023 |
Gregory Paul Woodd
Matakatia, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 03 May 2010 |
Director | 25 May 2006 - 01 Apr 2023 |
Brian Maxwell Stewart
Devonport, North Shore City, 0624
Address used since 25 May 2006 |
Director | 25 May 2006 - 01 Apr 2023 |
Sarah Martin
Matakana, 0985
Address used since 17 Oct 2013 |
Director | 17 Oct 2013 - 01 Apr 2023 |
Paul Matthew Hunter
Belmont, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 27 Jul 2021 |
Director | 27 Jul 2021 - 01 Apr 2023 |
Nicola Jane Russ
Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 15 Aug 2017
Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 31 Dec 2014 |
Director | 31 Dec 2014 - 21 Aug 2019 |
Christopher Desmond Western
Mairangi Bay, North Shore City, 0630
Address used since 25 May 2006 |
Director | 25 May 2006 - 16 Feb 2017 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 3, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Postal | 04 Jun 2020 |
C/-simpson Western, Level 4, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Records & shareregister | 05 Apr 2023 |
Level 4, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Registered | 17 Apr 2023 |
Level 4, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Service | 14 May 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Service | 26 Jul 2017 - 14 May 2024 |
Level 17, Aia House, 5-7 Byron Ave, Takapuna, Auckland | Registered & physical | 25 May 2006 - 26 Jul 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sw Trust Services (holdings) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051011994 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
05 Apr 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark, Robert Alan Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland |
25 May 2006 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Clark, Robert Alan Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland |
25 May 2006 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Hunter, Paul Matthew Individual |
Belmont Auckland 0622 |
29 Jul 2021 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Paterson, Kenneth James Director |
Milford North Shore City 0620 |
29 Jul 2021 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Barr, Jamie Matthew Director |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 |
29 Jul 2021 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Woodd, Gregory Paul Individual |
Matakatia Bay Whangaparaoa |
25 May 2006 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Woodd, Gregory Paul Individual |
Matakatia Bay Whangaparaoa |
25 May 2006 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Simpson, Gary Graeme Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
25 May 2006 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Simpson, Gary Graeme Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
25 May 2006 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Murphy, Candice Maria Director |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 |
29 Jul 2021 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Stewart, Brian Maxwell Individual |
Devonport North Shore City |
25 May 2006 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Stewart, Brian Maxwell Individual |
Devonport North Shore City |
25 May 2006 - 05 Apr 2023 |
Western, Christopher Desmond Individual |
Mairangi Bay North Shore City |
25 May 2006 - 27 Feb 2017 |
Crawfords Souvenirs Limited Level 1, 507 Lake Road |
|
Fit Futures Learning Institute Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
|
Portland Holdings Trustee Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
|
Sayles Corporate Trustee Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
|
Signcraftsmen Hamilton Limited Level 1, 6 Como Street |
|
Shipco Transport Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |