Apo Holdings Limited (NZBN 9429034171752) was started on 18 Apr 2006. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 31A Oban Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 (type: physical, registered). Unit 1, 19 Arrenway Drive, Albany, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 02 Nov 2020. Apo Holdings Limited used other names, namely: Solar Group Limited from 18 Apr 2006 to 17 Jun 2020. 191000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 190980 shares (99.99% of shares), namely:
Netzer, Roy (an individual) located at Browns Bay, Auckland postcode 0630,
Bowker, Phillip Geoffrey (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Netzer, Ronit (an individual) located at Browns Bay, Auckland postcode 0630. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.01% of all shares (exactly 10 shares); it includes
Netzer, Roy (an individual) - located at Browns Bay, Auckland. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (10 shares, 0.01%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Netzer, Ronit, located at Browns Bay, Auckland (an individual). Our information was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
35588, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0754 | Postal | 01 Jun 2019 |
31a Oban Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered & service | 02 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Roy Netzer
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 02 May 2014
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 08 Jul 2017 |
Director | 18 Apr 2006 - current |
Ronit Netzer
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 08 Jul 2017
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 02 May 2014 |
Director | 18 Apr 2006 - 07 Jun 2024 |
Craig James Le Quesne
Schnapper Rock, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 01 May 2012 |
Director | 13 Oct 2006 - 04 Oct 2012 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 1, 19 Arrenway Drive, Albany, Auckland | Physical & registered | 20 Oct 2006 - 02 Nov 2020 |
Level 3, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 18 Apr 2006 - 20 Oct 2006 |
31 Carbine Rd, Mt Wellington, Auckland | Registered | 18 Apr 2006 - 20 Oct 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Netzer, Roy Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
18 Apr 2006 - current |
Bowker, Phillip Geoffrey Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
04 Dec 2006 - current |
Netzer, Ronit Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
18 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Netzer, Roy Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
18 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Netzer, Ronit Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
18 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Locking Farm Equestrian Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039628879 Company Number: 337757 Entity |
02 Mar 2011 - 09 Jun 2017 | |
Natan, Yechezkel Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
18 Apr 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Locking Farm Equestrian Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039628879 Company Number: 337757 Entity |
02 Mar 2011 - 09 Jun 2017 |
Wellington Drive Technologies Share Scheme Trustee Limited 21 Arrenway Drive |
|
Wellington Drive Sales Limited 21 Arrenway Drive |
|
Cadac Limited 21 Arrenway Drive |
|
Aofrio Limited 21 Arrenway Drive |
|
Wiehahn And Associates Limited Unit T, 6 Rosedale Road |
|
Kdy Cook Limited 12 Arrenway Drive |