Hokianga Stage 1 Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034243374) was launched on 14 Mar 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 4, 57 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Level 4, 57 Fort Street, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 13 Mar 2020. 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Petrie Opononi Limited (an entity) located at Level 20, Pwc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland postcode 1010. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Petrie, Hazel (an individual) - located at Epsom, Auckland,
Atchison, Catherine Ann (an individual) - located at Epsom, Auckland,
Petrie, Anthony Nicholas (an individual) - located at Epsom, Auckland. Our data was updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 57 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Mar 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Anthony Nicholas Petrie
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 14 Mar 2006 |
Director | 14 Mar 2006 - current |
Shane Michael Lloydd
Omapere,
Address used since 26 May 2006 |
Director | 26 May 2006 - 27 Apr 2012 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 57 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 02 Mar 2020 - 13 Mar 2020 |
Level 4, 57 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 18 Feb 2020 - 13 Mar 2020 |
Level 4, 57 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 03 Apr 2019 - 02 Mar 2020 |
Level 4, 57 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 03 Apr 2019 - 18 Feb 2020 |
Level 5, 57 Fort Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 05 Apr 2013 - 03 Apr 2019 |
C/-martelli Mckegg, Level 20, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1141 | Registered & physical | 09 May 2012 - 05 Apr 2013 |
C/-martelli Mckegg Wells & Cormack, Level 20, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 14 Mar 2006 - 09 May 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Petrie Opononi Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034240830 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Level 20, Pwc Tower 188 Quay Street, Auckland 1010 |
14 Mar 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Petrie, Hazel Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
01 May 2012 - current |
Atchison, Catherine Ann Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
01 May 2012 - current |
Petrie, Anthony Nicholas Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
01 May 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wairua Estate Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034888599 Company Number: 1611108 Entity |
29 Sep 2006 - 01 May 2012 | |
Wairua Estate Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034888599 Company Number: 1611108 Entity |
29 Sep 2006 - 01 May 2012 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Petrie Opononi Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1787767 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 20, Pwc Tower 188 Quay Street Auckland 1010 |
Summit Forests New Zealand Limited Level 10 |
|
Emergent Limited Level 7 |
|
Emergent Group Limited Level 7 |
|
Ama Capital Management Limited Level 11 |
|
Delta Insurance Nominees Limited Level 8 |
|
Public Infrastructure Partners Lp Level 10 |