Keith St 95 Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034260302) was registered on 08 Mar 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 2 Mihaere Drive, Roslyn, Palmerston North, 4414 (type: registered, physical). 172 Kelvin Grove Road, Palmerston North had been their registered address, up until 24 Mar 2015. 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Dollery, Fiona Christine (an individual) located at Hokowhitu, Palmerston North postcode 4410,
Dollery, Andrew Charles (an individual) located at Hokowhitu, Palmerston North postcode 4410. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is the classification the ABS issued Keith St 95 Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 15 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Mihaere Drive, Roslyn, Palmerston North, 4414 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Mar 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Charles Dollery
Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 25 Jul 2020
Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4414
Address used since 22 Oct 2015
Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 30 Jan 2019 |
Director | 08 Mar 2006 - current |
Janice Margaret Brougham
Palmerston North, 4414
Address used since 08 Mar 2006 |
Director | 08 Mar 2006 - 17 Jul 2014 |
Colin Jeffrey Bary
Palmerston North,
Address used since 08 Mar 2006 |
Director | 08 Mar 2006 - 21 Apr 2009 |
Kylie Maree Bary
Palmerston North,
Address used since 08 Mar 2006 |
Director | 08 Mar 2006 - 21 Apr 2009 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
172 Kelvin Grove Road, Palmerston North | Registered & physical | 08 Mar 2006 - 24 Mar 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dollery, Fiona Christine Individual |
Hokowhitu Palmerston North 4410 |
08 Mar 2006 - current |
Dollery, Andrew Charles Individual |
Hokowhitu Palmerston North 4410 |
08 Mar 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart, Bruce Anthony Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Mar 2006 - 08 Mar 2006 |
Bary, Colin Jeffrey Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Mar 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Bary, Colin Jeffrey Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Mar 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Stewart, Bruce Anthony Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Mar 2006 - 08 Mar 2006 |
Bary, Kylie Maree Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Mar 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Bary, Kylie Maree Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Mar 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Brougham, Janice Margaret Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Mar 2006 - 21 Jan 2016 |
Brougham, Tony Richard Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Mar 2006 - 21 Jan 2016 |
Telco Two Limited 2a Mihaere Drive |
|
Telcospec Limited 2a Mihaere Drive |
|
Cableguy Limited 2a Mihaere Drive |
|
Small Wings Limited 104 Cessna Road |
|
Mission Kayaking NZ Limited 16 Sutton Place |
|
Current Craft Limited 16 Sutton Place |
Traill Property Limited 71 Royal Oak Drive |
Jand Limited 39 Royal Oak Drive |
Sigma Limited 5 Adams Place |
Tuluk Limited 9 Daniel Place |
Cdla Consulting Limited 24 Cleveland Heights |
Kylierose Limited 336 Broadway Avenue |