Holland Beckett Trustee No.6 Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034354841) was incorporated on 02 Feb 2006. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: office, physical). C/ -Holland Beckett, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga 3110 had been their registered address, up until 06 Aug 2012. 1 share is allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Pingao Trustee Holdings Limited (an entity) located at 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga postcode 3110. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Holland Beckett Trustee No.6 Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 24 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
525 Cameron Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Office | unknown |
525 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Aug 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dean Andrew Thompson
Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 08 Sep 2011
Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 05 Jul 2019 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - current |
John David Mackay
Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 12 Nov 2018
Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 24 Jan 2011 |
Director | 30 Aug 2007 - current |
Luke Andrew Stewart
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 01 Apr 2014 |
Director | 01 Apr 2014 - current |
Kenneth Charles Walter Hawkes
Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 02 Jun 2023 |
Director | 02 Jun 2023 - current |
Georgina Brettargh Smith
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 02 Jun 2023 |
Director | 02 Jun 2023 - current |
Joel David Murphy
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 02 Jun 2023 |
Director | 02 Jun 2023 - current |
Samuel Tabak
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 02 Jun 2023 |
Director | 02 Jun 2023 - current |
William Beau Holland
Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 24 Jan 2011 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - 02 Jun 2023 |
Simon Paul Collett
Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 24 Jan 2011 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - 01 Apr 2023 |
Allen Conway Hunter
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 24 Jan 2011 |
Director | 18 Mar 2010 - 04 Jun 2020 |
Mark Eaton Tingey
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 04 Jul 2016 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - 31 Mar 2020 |
Michael Joseph Sharp
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 24 Jan 2011 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - 20 Jul 2014 |
John Douglas Patterson
Matua, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 24 Jan 2011 |
Director | 18 Mar 2010 - 03 Feb 2014 |
John Douglas Patterson
Tauranga,
Address used since 16 Jun 2009 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - 19 Oct 2009 |
Allen Conway Hunter
Tauranga,
Address used since 16 Jun 2009 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - 19 Oct 2009 |
Stephen Thomas Scott
Tauranga,
Address used since 02 Feb 2006 |
Director | 02 Feb 2006 - 06 Oct 2006 |
525 Cameron Road , Tauranga , Tauranga , 3110 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/ -holland Beckett, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga 3110 | Registered & physical | 27 Oct 2009 - 06 Aug 2012 |
C/-holland Beckett, 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga | Registered & physical | 02 Sep 2008 - 27 Oct 2009 |
C/-holland Beckett, 96 Cameron Road, Tauranga | Physical & registered | 02 Feb 2006 - 02 Sep 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pingao Trustee Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046200815 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
525 Cameron Road Tauranga 3110 |
03 Apr 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tingey, Mark Eaton Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
02 Feb 2006 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Thompson, Dean Andrew Individual |
Tauranga South Tauranga 3112 |
02 Feb 2006 - 03 Apr 2020 |
Hbt Melville Limited 525 Cameron Road |
|
Kiwispout NZ Limited Suite 1, 525 Cameron Road |
|
Le Monastere Trustee Limited 525 Cameron Road |
|
Holland Beckett Trustee No.13 Limited 525 Cameron Road |
|
Hampton Court Holdings Limited 525 Cameron Road |
|
Holland Beckett Corporate Trustee (gartshore) Limited 525 Cameron Road |
Hbt Melville Limited 525 Cameron Road |
Le Monastere Trustee Limited 525 Cameron Road |
Holland Beckett Trustee No.13 Limited 525 Cameron Road |
Holland Beckett Corporate Trustee (gartshore) Limited 525 Cameron Road |
Holland Beckett Trustee No.12 Limited 525 Cameron Road |
Holland Beckett Trustee No.11 Limited 525 Cameron Road |