Egmond Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034366813) was launched on 23 Jan 2006. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 91 Kanuka Road, Rd 1, Bombay, 2675 (type: registered, service). 509A Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland had been their registered address, until 21 Mar 2024. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 70 shares (70% of shares), namely:
Liefting, Ngaire (an individual) located at Rd 1, Bombay postcode 2675. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 30% of all shares (exactly 30 shares); it includes
Liefting, Nicolaas Petrus Maria (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Bombay. Businesscheck's database was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
91 Kanuka Road, Bombay, South Auckland | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 23 Jan 2006 |
511 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 | Physical | 18 Apr 2016 |
511 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 | Postal | 03 Mar 2021 |
91 Kanuka Road, Rd 1, Bombay, 2675 | Registered & service | 21 Mar 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ngaire Liefting
Rd 1, Bombay, 2675
Address used since 22 Nov 2016 |
Director | 22 Nov 2016 - current |
Nicholaas Petrus Maria Liefting
Rd 1, Bombay, 2675
Address used since 24 May 2010 |
Director | 23 Jan 2006 - 22 Nov 2016 |
Ngaire Liefting
Bombay, South Auckland,
Address used since 23 Jan 2006 |
Director | 23 Jan 2006 - 30 Oct 2006 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
91 Kanuka Road, Rd 1, Bombay, 2675 | Registered & service | 21 Mar 2024 |
91 Kanukau Road , Rd1 , South Auckland , 2675 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
509a Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 | Registered & service | 15 Feb 2024 - 21 Mar 2024 |
511 Rosebank Road, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 | Registered & service | 18 Apr 2016 - 15 Feb 2024 |
91 Kanuka Road, Rd 1, Bombay, 2675 | Physical & registered | 28 Jun 2011 - 18 Apr 2016 |
91 Kanuka Road, Bombay, South Auckland | Registered & physical | 23 Jan 2006 - 28 Jun 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Liefting, Ngaire Individual |
Rd 1 Bombay 2675 |
23 Jan 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Liefting, Nicolaas Petrus Maria Individual |
Rd 1 Bombay 2675 |
23 Jan 2006 - current |
Hoeksema Decorating Limited 511 Rosebank Road |
|
Totsuka Investments Limited 511 Rosebank Road |
|
Successful Holdings Limited 511 Rosebank Road |
|
Street Wise Automotive Limited 511 Rosebank Road |
|
Ensure Financial Limited 511 Rosebank Road |
|
Ensure Nominee Trustees Limited 511 Rosebank Road |