J M Jones Limited (issued a business number of 9429034378694) was registered on 18 Jan 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 2, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, physical). C/-Pkf Ross Melville, Level 5, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland 1010 had been their physical address, up to 04 Feb 2010. 120 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 40 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Jones, Helen Elizabeth Crawford (an individual) located at Westmere, Auckland postcode 1022. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (40 shares); it includes
Jones, Angela Claire Crawford (an individual) - located at Devonport, Auckland. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (40 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Jones, Katherine Sian Crawford, located at Devonport, Auckland (an individual). Our information was last updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Feb 2010 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Helen Elizabeth Crawford Jones
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 24 Nov 2011 |
Director | 18 Jan 2006 - current |
Katherine Sian Crawford Jones
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 18 Jan 2006 |
Director | 18 Jan 2006 - current |
Angela Claire Crawford Jones
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 24 Nov 2011 |
Director | 18 Jan 2006 - current |
Julia Catherine Owens
Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 09 Dec 2019 |
Director | 09 Dec 2019 - current |
Athol Raymond Owens
Newmarket, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 24 Nov 2015 |
Director | 05 Feb 2010 - 09 Dec 2019 |
Neilson Murdoch Harris
Takapuna, Auckland,
Address used since 18 Jan 2006 |
Director | 18 Jan 2006 - 19 Nov 2009 |
Robert Narev
Orakei, Auckland,
Address used since 18 Jan 2006 |
Director | 18 Jan 2006 - 17 Nov 2009 |
Jennifer May Jones
Campbells Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 18 Jan 2006 |
Director | 18 Jan 2006 - 10 Jun 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-pkf Ross Melville, Level 5, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland 1010 | Physical & registered | 03 Dec 2009 - 04 Feb 2010 |
C/-ross Melville Pkf, Level 5, 50 Anzac Avenue, Auckland | Registered & physical | 03 Dec 2007 - 03 Dec 2009 |
C/-mrs J M Jones, 21 View Road, Campbells Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 18 Jan 2006 - 03 Dec 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Helen Elizabeth Crawford Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
21 Dec 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Angela Claire Crawford Individual |
Devonport Auckland 0624 |
21 Dec 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Katherine Sian Crawford Individual |
Devonport Auckland 0624 |
21 Dec 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Jennifer May Individual |
Campbells Bay Auckland |
18 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Business In The Community (2013) Limited Level 3, 255 Broadway |
|
Penrose Panel And Roofing Limited Level 2, 161 Manukau Road |
|
Exodus Trustees Limited Level 1, 10 Manukau Road |
|
Marianas Capital Limited Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket |
|
Growingfund Investment Limited Level 1, 169 Manukau Road |
|
K J M Holdings Limited Level 1, 145 Manukau Road |