Mavistan Vaughan Trustee Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034383650) was registered on 15 Dec 2005. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 109 Pemberton Avenue, Bayview, Auckland, 0629 (type: physical, registered). 1 Gilberd Place, Torbay, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 20 May 2019. 1000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Protector Limited (an entity) located at Rosedale, North Shore City postcode 0632. Our database was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
109 Pemberton Avenue, Bayview, Auckland, 0629 | Postal & office & delivery | 12 May 2019 |
109 Pemberton Avenue, Bayview, Auckland, 0629 | Physical & registered & service | 20 May 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael John Vaughan
Bayview, Auckland, 0629
Address used since 10 May 2018 |
Director | 10 May 2018 - current |
Marilyn Ann Lunt
Torbay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 10 May 2018 |
Director | 10 May 2018 - current |
Mavis Vaughan
Torbay, North Shore, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 15 Dec 2005 |
Director | 15 Dec 2005 - 28 May 2018 |
Eric Stanley Vaughan
Torbay, North Shore, Auckland,
Address used since 15 Dec 2005 |
Director | 15 Dec 2005 - 02 Aug 2008 |
109 Pemberton Avenue , Bayview , Auckland , 0629 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Gilberd Place, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered | 15 Dec 2005 - 20 May 2019 |
1 Gliberd Place, Torbay, North Shore, Auckland | Physical & registered | 15 Dec 2005 - 15 Dec 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Protector Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038164507 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rosedale North Shore City 0632 |
18 May 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Vaughan, Mavis Individual |
Torbay North Shore, Auckland |
15 Dec 2005 - 18 May 2018 |
Vaughan, Eric Stanley Individual |
Torbay North Shore, Auckland |
15 Dec 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
M & S Finance Limited 2a Cliff Road |
|
North East Nominees Limited 7 Gilberd Place |
|
Wales Consulting Limited 6a Morlie Place |
|
Roys Property Holdings Limited 12 Gilberd Place |
|
Seamans Electrical Limited 12 Gilberd Place |
|
East Coast Bays Electrical Services Limited 12 Gilberd Place |